This case was last updated from Choctaw County Courts on 03/11/2022 at 22:27:44 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF: THE ESTATE OF CHARLES MANUEL BOLES, DECEASED

Case Summary

On 09/23/2021 IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATE OF CHARLES MANUEL BOLES, DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Choctaw County Courts, Choctaw County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is BAZE, BILL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0043

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Choctaw, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

BAZE, BILL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BOLES, CHARLES MANUEL

Defendant

: THE ESTATE OF CHARLES MANUEL BOLES, DECEASED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

DUNCAN, AMBER

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

P O Box 208

Antlers, OK 74523

ASHWORTH, STUART P

Us Department Of The Interior, 7906 E 33Rd St, Suite 100

Tulsa, OK 74145

 

Court Documents

COMBINED ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF

12/20/2021: COMBINED ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: GENERAL INVENTORY AND APPRAISEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COMBINED ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: NOTICE OF CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • HearingEvent: HEARING ON PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER APPOINTING ADMINISTRATRIX/PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE & ENTER PETITION; Amount: $ 135.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Duncan, Amber