This case was last updated from Cleveland County Courts on 04/15/2022 at 09:54:56 (UTC).

In The Matter of the Estate of Catherine Sue McGrath, deceased.

Case Summary

On 09/15/2021 In The Matter of the Estate of Catherine Sue McGrath, deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Cleveland County Courts, Cleveland County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Stanley, Bethany. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-387

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Cleveland, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Stanley, Bethany

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Allen, Barbara

Decedent

Mcgrath, Catherine Sue

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Spencer, Katie M.

Attorney at BALL MORSE LOWE, PLLC

531 Couch Drive, Suite 201

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Wright, Jennifer L.

Attorney at BALL MORSE LOWE, PLLC

531 Couch Drive, Suite 201

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

03/04/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

NOTICE OF HEARING PETITION FOR SETTLEMENT OF ESTATE, FOR ORDER ALLOWING ATTORNEY'S FEES, DETERMINATION OF HEIRSHIP AND FOR DECREE OF FINAL DISTRIBUTION AND DISCHARGE OF PERSNAL REPRESENTATIVE / MARCH 31, 2022 AT 9:00 A.M. (BS)

03/01/2022: NOTICE OF HEARING PETITION FOR SETTLEMENT OF ESTATE, FOR ORDER ALLOWING ATTORNEY'S FEES, DETERMINATION OF HEIRSHIP AND FOR DECREE OF FINAL DISTRIBUTION AND DISCHARGE OF PERSNAL REPRESENTATIVE / MARCH 31, 2022 AT 9:00 A.M. (BS)

ORDER FOR HEARING PETITION FOR SETTLEMENT OF ESTATE, FOR ORDER ALLOWING ATTORNEY'S FEES, DETERMINATION OF HEIRSHIP AND FOR DECREE OF FINAL DISTRIBUTION AND DISCHARGE OF PERSNAL REPRESENTATIVE / MARCH 31, 2022 AT 9:00 A.M. (BS)

03/01/2022: ORDER FOR HEARING PETITION FOR SETTLEMENT OF ESTATE, FOR ORDER ALLOWING ATTORNEY'S FEES, DETERMINATION OF HEIRSHIP AND FOR DECREE OF FINAL DISTRIBUTION AND DISCHARGE OF PERSNAL REPRESENTATIVE / MARCH 31, 2022 AT 9:00 A.M. (BS)

PETITION FOR SETTLEMENT OF ESTATE, FOR ORDER ALLOWING ATTORNEY'S FEES, DETERMINATION OF HEIRSHIP AND FOR DECREE OF FINAL DISTRIBUTION AND DISCHARGE OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

03/01/2022: PETITION FOR SETTLEMENT OF ESTATE, FOR ORDER ALLOWING ATTORNEY'S FEES, DETERMINATION OF HEIRSHIP AND FOR DECREE OF FINAL DISTRIBUTION AND DISCHARGE OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE -- CALEB R. STILES FOR BARBARA ALLEN

03/01/2022: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE -- CALEB R. STILES FOR BARBARA ALLEN

WAIVER OF INVENTORY, ACCOUNTING, APPRAISEMENTS, AND NOTICE OF HEARINGS - JENNIE NAIL

10/20/2021: WAIVER OF INVENTORY, ACCOUNTING, APPRAISEMENTS, AND NOTICE OF HEARINGS - JENNIE NAIL

WAIVER OF INVENTORY, ACCOUNTING, APPRAISEMENTS, AND NOTICE OF HEARINGS - JENNIE NAIL

10/20/2021: WAIVER OF INVENTORY, ACCOUNTING, APPRAISEMENTS, AND NOTICE OF HEARINGS - JENNIE NAIL

AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING NOTICE TO CREDITORS

11/03/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING NOTICE TO CREDITORS

PROOF OF PUBLICATION / THE NORMAN TRANSCRIPT / PUB DATES 10-20 & 10-27-21

10/29/2021: PROOF OF PUBLICATION / THE NORMAN TRANSCRIPT / PUB DATES 10-20 & 10-27-21

ORDER AUTHORIZING SALE OF REAL PROPERTY, WAIVING THE FILING OF ANY ACCOUNTING AND AN INVENTORY AND APPRAISEMENT (BS)

10/21/2021: ORDER AUTHORIZING SALE OF REAL PROPERTY, WAIVING THE FILING OF ANY ACCOUNTING AND AN INVENTORY AND APPRAISEMENT (BS)

WAIVER OF INVENTORY, ACCOUNTING, APPRAISEMENTS, AND NOTICE OF HEARINGS / ROBERT ALLEN

10/20/2021: WAIVER OF INVENTORY, ACCOUNTING, APPRAISEMENTS, AND NOTICE OF HEARINGS / ROBERT ALLEN

WAIVER OF INVENTORY, ACCOUNTING, APPRAISEMENTS, AND NOTICE OF HEARINGS / BARBARA ALLEN

10/20/2021: WAIVER OF INVENTORY, ACCOUNTING, APPRAISEMENTS, AND NOTICE OF HEARINGS / BARBARA ALLEN

WAIVER OF INVENTORY, ACCOUNTING, APPRAISEMENTS, AND NOTICE OF HEARINGS / DEBORAH COLEMAN-JONES

10/20/2021: WAIVER OF INVENTORY, ACCOUNTING, APPRAISEMENTS, AND NOTICE OF HEARINGS / DEBORAH COLEMAN-JONES

NOTICE TO CREDITORS

10/14/2021: NOTICE TO CREDITORS

LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION (BS)

10/14/2021: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION (BS)

ORDER APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENATIVE AND JUDICIAL DETERMINATION OF HEIRS (BS)

10/14/2021: ORDER APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENATIVE AND JUDICIAL DETERMINATION OF HEIRS (BS)

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE

10/14/2021: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE

ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL OF RECORD (BS)

10/12/2021: ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL OF RECORD (BS)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketCode: MO; Description: MOTION FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • HearingEvent: HEARING; Docket: Bethany Stanley

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • DocketCode: O; Description: ORDER SETLING ESTATE, ALLOWING ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS, DETERMINATION OF HEIRSHIP AND DECREE OF DISTRIBUTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketCode: PP; Description: PROOF OF PUBLICATION / THE NORMAN TRANSCRIPT / MARCH 5, 2022 / MARCH 12, 2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketCode: PP; Description: PROOF OF PUBLICATION / THE NORMAN TRANSCRIPT / MARCH 5, 2022 / MARCH 12, 2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketCode: PP; Description: PROOF OF PUBLICATION / NORMAN TRANSCRIPT 3-5, 3-12-22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: AFM; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: NOH; Description: NOTICE OF HEARING PETITION FOR SETTLEMENT OF ESTATE, FOR ORDER ALLOWING ATTORNEY'S FEES, DETERMINATION OF HEIRSHIP AND FOR DECREE OF FINAL DISTRIBUTION AND DISCHARGE OF PERSNAL REPRESENTATIVE / MARCH 31, 2022 AT 9:00 A.M. (BS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: OH; Description: ORDER FOR HEARING PETITION FOR SETTLEMENT OF ESTATE, FOR ORDER ALLOWING ATTORNEY'S FEES, DETERMINATION OF HEIRSHIP AND FOR DECREE OF FINAL DISTRIBUTION AND DISCHARGE OF PERSNAL REPRESENTATIVE / MARCH 31, 2022 AT 9:00 A.M. (BS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: P; Description: PETITION FOR SETTLEMENT OF ESTATE, FOR ORDER ALLOWING ATTORNEY'S FEES, DETERMINATION OF HEIRSHIP AND FOR DECREE OF FINAL DISTRIBUTION AND DISCHARGE OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
44 More Docket Entries
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office; Amount: $ 135.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketCode: PROBATE; Description: PROBATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PROBATE INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: PROBATE(PROBATE)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SPENCER, KATIE M