This case was last updated from Caddo County Courts on 09/09/2021 at 04:52:10 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF: THE ESTATE OF CAROL PETERS, DECEASED

Case Summary

On 06/25/2018 IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATE OF CAROL PETERS, DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Caddo County Courts, Caddo County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is HILL, S. WYATT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0052

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Caddo, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

HILL, S. WYATT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PETERS, CAROL

Defendant

: THE ESTATE OF CAROL PETERS, DECEASED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

BUZBEE UPCHURCH SQUIRES & EAST

Attorney at BUZBEE UPCHURCH SQUIRES & EAST

P O Box 765203 West Broadway

Anadarko, OK 73005

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2018
  • DocketDescription: DISTRIBUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • DocketDescription: ORDER ALLOWING FINAL ACCOUNT AND FINAL DECREE OF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2018
  • HearingEvent: FINAL ACCOUNT HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • DocketDescription: DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • DocketDescription: ORDER ALLOWING FINAL ACCOUNT DISTRIBUTION OF ESTATE AND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • DocketDescription: FINAL ACCOUNT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE PETITION FOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • DocketDescription: 1% PDG; Amount: $ 1.13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION; Amount: $ 112.76

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • HearingEvent: HEARING DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 06/25/2018
  • DocketDescription: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • DocketDescription: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • DocketDescription: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • DocketDescription: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • DocketDescription: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • DocketDescription: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • DocketDescription: OCIS FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • DocketDescription: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • DocketDescription: WILL AND TESTAMENT; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • DocketDescription: FILE AND ENTER PETITION FOR ANCILLARY PROBATE OF LAST; Amount: $ 135.00

    Read MoreRead Less