This case was last updated from Jackson County Courts on 04/10/2022 at 16:44:11 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF: THE ESTATE OF BOBBIE C. MCMINN, DECEASED

Case Summary

On 07/28/2021 IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATE OF BOBBIE C MCMINN, DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Jackson County Courts, Jackson County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is HUEY, CLARK E.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0035

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Jackson, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

HUEY, CLARK E.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MCMINN, BOBBIE C.

Defendant

: THE ESTATE OF BOBBIE C. MCMINN, DECEASED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

GUNKEL LAW GROUP PLLC

Attorney at GUNKEL LAW GROUP PLLC

Po Box 1124

Altus, OK 73522

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CREDITORS CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING NOTICE TO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CORRECTED AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING PETITION FOR PROBATE OF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: INVENTORY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER WAIVING REQUIREMENTS FOR SALES, ACCOUNTING OR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ACCOUNTING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: APPLICATION TO WAIVE REQUIREMENTS FOR SALES AND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: WRITTEN STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AND LEGATEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: REPRESENTATIVE, AND DETERMINATION OF HEIRS, DEVISEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL, APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL; Amount: $ 135.00

    Read MoreRead Less