This case was last updated from Murray County Courts on 12/01/2022 at 02:44:38 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF: THE ESTATE OF BARBARA J. OGLESBY, DECEASED

Case Summary

On 06/30/2021 IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATE OF BARBARA J OGLESBY, DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Murray County Courts, Murray County Courthouse located in Statewide, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is DUCK, AARON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0030

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Murray, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

DUCK, AARON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OGLESBY, BARBARA J.

Defendant

: THE ESTATE OF BARBARA J. OGLESBY, DECEASED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

CHAFFIN, BILL

P.O. Box 538

Davis, OK 73030

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

11/29/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

ORDER ALLOWING FINAL ACCOUNT, DETERMINATION OF

11/24/2021: ORDER ALLOWING FINAL ACCOUNT, DETERMINATION OF

AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION

11/23/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION

AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

11/01/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

NOTICE OF HEARING ON FINAL ACCOUNT AND PETITION FOR

11/01/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING ON FINAL ACCOUNT AND PETITION FOR

ORDER SETTING HEARING ON FINAL ACCOUNT AND PETITION FOR

11/01/2021: ORDER SETTING HEARING ON FINAL ACCOUNT AND PETITION FOR

FINAL ACCOUNT AND PEITION FOR ORDER ALLOWING FINAL

11/01/2021: FINAL ACCOUNT AND PEITION FOR ORDER ALLOWING FINAL

AFFAIDAVIT OF NON-MAILING OF NOTICE TO CREDITORS

11/01/2021: AFFAIDAVIT OF NON-MAILING OF NOTICE TO CREDITORS

AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION

08/11/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION

ORDER WAIVING THE FILING OF INVENTORY AND APPRAISEMENT

08/09/2021: ORDER WAIVING THE FILING OF INVENTORY AND APPRAISEMENT

CONSENT AND WAIVER

08/09/2021: CONSENT AND WAIVER

APPLICATION TO WAIVE THE FILING OF AN INVENTORY AND

08/09/2021: APPLICATION TO WAIVE THE FILING OF AN INVENTORY AND

LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT OF BARBARA J. OGLESBY

07/22/2021: LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT OF BARBARA J. OGLESBY

ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE, APPOINTMENT OF

07/22/2021: ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE, APPOINTMENT OF

LETTERS TESTAMENTARY

07/22/2021: LETTERS TESTAMENTARY

APPOINTMENT OF AGENT

07/22/2021: APPOINTMENT OF AGENT

NOTICE TO CREDITORS

07/22/2021: NOTICE TO CREDITORS

AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION

07/19/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • HearingEvent: LETTERS ADM/TEST UNCONTESTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: HEIRSHIP, DISTRIBUTION, AND DISCHARGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER ALLOWING FINAL ACCOUNT, DETERMINATION OF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: HEIRSHIP, DISTRIBUTION, AND DISCHARGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER ALLOWING FINAL ACCOUNT, DETERMINATION OF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: NOTICE OF HEARING ON FINAL ACCOUNT AND PETITION FOR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: HEIRSHIP, DISTRIBUTION, AND DISCHARGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGHTY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OCIS; Amount: $ 25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION; Amount: $ 7.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY; Amount: $ 6.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE & ENTER PETITION FOR PROBATE; Amount: $ 135.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less