This case was last updated from Garfield County Courts on 06/16/2022 at 10:22:01 (UTC).

Estate of NELLIE L CATLETT, Deceased,

Case Summary

On 01/18/2022 Estate of NELLIE L CATLETT, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Garfield County Courts, Garfield County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Newby, Tom. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****22-9

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Garfield, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Newby, Tom

 

Party Details

Petitioner

WOFFORD, GWEN LYNETTE

Defendant

CATLETT

Decedent

CATLETT, NELLIE L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

HENNIGH, KALEB K

Attorney at Ewbank Hennigh & McVay PLLC

Po Box 6207

Enid, OK 73702

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

05/31/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

ORDER APPROVING FINAL ACCOUNT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, DETERMINING HEIRS, DISTRIBUTING ESTATE AND DISCHARGING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

05/27/2022: ORDER APPROVING FINAL ACCOUNT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, DETERMINING HEIRS, DISTRIBUTING ESTATE AND DISCHARGING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

ORDER AUTHORIZING SERVICE BY PUBLICATION

05/13/2022: ORDER AUTHORIZING SERVICE BY PUBLICATION

NOTICE OF HEARING BY PUBLICATION

05/12/2022: NOTICE OF HEARING BY PUBLICATION

APPLICATION TO OBTAIN SERVICE BY PUBLICATION

05/12/2022: APPLICATION TO OBTAIN SERVICE BY PUBLICATION

AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION- NOTICE OF HEARING #25831 (LEGAL NEWS)

05/11/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION- NOTICE OF HEARING #25831 (LEGAL NEWS)

AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

05/03/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

NOTICE OF HEARING FINAL ACCOUNT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE , PETITION FOR DETERMINATION OF HEIRS, DISTRIBUTION OF ESTATE AND DISCHARGE

04/29/2022: NOTICE OF HEARING FINAL ACCOUNT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE , PETITION FOR DETERMINATION OF HEIRS, DISTRIBUTION OF ESTATE AND DISCHARGE

ORDER FOR HEARING FINAL ACCOUNT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, PETITION FOR DETERMINATION OF HEIRS, DISTRIBUTION OF ESTATE AND DISCHARGE

04/28/2022: ORDER FOR HEARING FINAL ACCOUNT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, PETITION FOR DETERMINATION OF HEIRS, DISTRIBUTION OF ESTATE AND DISCHARGE

FINAL ACCOUNT, PETITION FOR DETERMINATION OF HEIRS, DISTRIBUTION OF ESTATE AND DISCHARGE

04/28/2022: FINAL ACCOUNT, PETITION FOR DETERMINATION OF HEIRS, DISTRIBUTION OF ESTATE AND DISCHARGE

AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION- NOTICE TO CREDITORS #25578 (LEGAL NEWS)

02/16/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION- NOTICE TO CREDITORS #25578 (LEGAL NEWS)

AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING OF NOTICE TO CREDITORS

02/07/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING OF NOTICE TO CREDITORS

CONSENT TO LETTERS AND WAIVER OF BOND - JEFF TIDBALL

02/07/2022: CONSENT TO LETTERS AND WAIVER OF BOND - JEFF TIDBALL

CONSENT TO LETTERS AND WAIVER OF BOND - SONYA BIGBEY

02/07/2022: CONSENT TO LETTERS AND WAIVER OF BOND - SONYA BIGBEY

NOTICE TO CREDITORS

02/02/2022: NOTICE TO CREDITORS

LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION- GWEN WOFFORD

02/02/2022: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION- GWEN WOFFORD

ORDER APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

02/02/2022: ORDER APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

TESTIMONY OF PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

02/02/2022: TESTIMONY OF PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: AFM; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • HearingEvent: HEARING; Docket: Tom Newby

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: O; Description: ORDER APPROVING FINAL ACCOUNT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, DETERMINING HEIRS, DISTRIBUTING ESTATE AND DISCHARGING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: O; Description: ORDER AUTHORIZING SERVICE BY PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: NOH; Description: NOTICE OF HEARING BY PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: APLI; Description: APPLICATION TO OBTAIN SERVICE BY PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PP; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION- NOTICE OF HEARING #25831 (LEGAL NEWS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: AFM; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: NOH; Description: NOTICE OF HEARING FINAL ACCOUNT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE , PETITION FOR DETERMINATION OF HEIRS, DISTRIBUTION OF ESTATE AND DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: OH; Description: ORDER FOR HEARING FINAL ACCOUNT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, PETITION FOR DETERMINATION OF HEIRS, DISTRIBUTION OF ESTATE AND DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION; Amount: $ 135.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCode: PROBATE; Description: PROBATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PROBATE INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: PROBATE(PROBATE); Disposed: Pending.

    Read MoreRead Less