This case was last updated from Carter County Courts on 09/20/2021 at 00:35:19 (UTC).

IN THE APPLICATION FOR PROCESS SERVER LICENSE: RICHARD BARTON PAYNE

Case Summary

On 07/15/2020 IN THE APPLICATION FOR PROCESS SERVER LICENSE RICHARD BARTON PAYNE was filed as an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit. This case was filed in Carter County Courts, Carter County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is BROOKS, CARSON M.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0003

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Carter, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

BROOKS, CARSON M.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PAYNE, RICHARD BARTON

 

Court Documents

ORDER FILED (DISPO 11-24-20 @ 10 AMREC BK)

08/18/2020: ORDER FILED (DISPO 11-24-20 @ 10 AMREC BK)

FILED COURT MINUTE ON PRELIMINARY HEARING CONFERENCE.

08/19/2020: FILED COURT MINUTE ON PRELIMINARY HEARING CONFERENCE.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2021
  • HearingEvent: PROCESS SERVER LICENSE EXPIRES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • HearingEvent: PROCESS SERVER LICENSE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORDER, FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION, FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: PROCESS SERVER BOND, FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketDescription: AJE: COST DUE TO CARD ALLOCATION FEE; Amount: $ 9.11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketDescription: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -0.25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketDescription: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -0.04

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketDescription: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -0.13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketDescription: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -0.18

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketDescription: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketDescription: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketDescription: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketDescription: LICENSE FEE; Amount: $ 150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketDescription: PROOF OF POSTING, FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketDescription: PUBLIC NOTICE POSTED ON COURTHOUSE DOOR; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office; Amount: $ 30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketDescription: PUBLIC NOTICE MAILED TO DA, SHERIFF & OSBI; Amount: $ 30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketDescription: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketDescription: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketDescription: FILE & ENTER APPLICATION; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office; Amount: $ 85.00

    Read MoreRead Less