This case was last updated from Pottawatomie County Courts on 01/16/2023 at 09:26:24 (UTC).

IN THE APPLICATION FOR PROCESS SERVER LICENSE: PENELOPE K. (PENNY) TREEBY

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 IN THE APPLICATION FOR PROCESS SERVER LICENSE PENELOPE K PENNY TREEBY was filed as an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit. This case was filed in Pottawatomie County Courts, Pottawatomie County Courthouse located in Statewide, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is CANAVAN, JOHN G. JR.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0001

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Pottawatomie, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

CANAVAN, JOHN G. JR.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TREEBY, PENELOPE K. (PENNY)

 

Court Documents

FILE PUBLIC NOTICE- PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER LICENSE -

01/22/2020: FILE PUBLIC NOTICE- PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER LICENSE -

FILE PROOF OF POSTING AND CERTIFICATE OF MAILING NOTICE

01/27/2020: FILE PROOF OF POSTING AND CERTIFICATE OF MAILING NOTICE

FILE PROOF OF MAILING CERTIFIED MAIL TO OKLAHOMA STATE

01/27/2020: FILE PROOF OF MAILING CERTIFIED MAIL TO OKLAHOMA STATE

FILE PROOF OF MAILING CERTIFIED MAIL TO DISTRICT

01/27/2020: FILE PROOF OF MAILING CERTIFIED MAIL TO DISTRICT

FILE PROOF OF MAILING CERTIFIED MAIL TO POTTAWATOMIE

01/27/2020: FILE PROOF OF MAILING CERTIFIED MAIL TO POTTAWATOMIE

FILE PROOF OF MAILING CERTIFIED MAIL TO POTTAWATOMIE

01/31/2020: FILE PROOF OF MAILING CERTIFIED MAIL TO POTTAWATOMIE

FILE PROOF OF MAILING GERTIFIED MAIL TO POTT. COUNTY

01/31/2020: FILE PROOF OF MAILING GERTIFIED MAIL TO POTT. COUNTY

FILE PROOF OF MAILING CERTIFIED MAIL TO OKLAHOMA STATE

02/03/2020: FILE PROOF OF MAILING CERTIFIED MAIL TO OKLAHOMA STATE

FILE AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION

02/04/2020: FILE AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION

FILE BOND

02/13/2020: FILE BOND

FILE STATEWIDE PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER LICENSE- THIS

02/18/2020: FILE STATEWIDE PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER LICENSE- THIS

FILE ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR STATEWIDE PRIVATE

02/18/2020: FILE ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR STATEWIDE PRIVATE

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2023
  • HearingEvent: PROCESS SERVER LICENSE EXPIRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • HearingEvent: PROCESS SERVER HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • HearingEvent: PROCESS SERVER LICENSE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ON 02-18-2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PROCESS SERVER ISSUED AS OF 02-18-2020 AND WILL EXPIRE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PROCESS SERVER LICENSE AS OF 02-18-2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR STATEWIDE PRIVATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FOR 3 CALENDAR YEARS.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: THE SAME ON THE 02-18-2020 AND SHALL REMAIN EFFECTIVE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LICENSE IS EFFECTIVE FROM THE DATE THE COURT GRANTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: POSTING; Amount: $ 30.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: MAILING X3; Amount: $ 30.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: APPLICATION FEE; Amount: $ 15.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE APPLICATION - RENEW STATE PPS (COURT COST); Document Available at Court Clerk's Office; Amount: $ 85.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less