This case was last updated from Payne County Courts on 03/21/2022 at 20:22:04 (UTC).

In re the Marriage of: Webb, Patsy Ann and Webb, Donald Joe

Case Summary

On 01/20/2022 In re the Marriage of Webb, Patsy Ann and Webb, Donald Joe was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Payne County Courts, Payne County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Thomas, Katherine E.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2-15

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Payne, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Thomas, Katherine E.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Webb, Patsy Ann

Respondent

Webb, Donald Joe

 

Court Documents

PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

01/20/2022: PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

FOREIGN SERVICE - TO SHERIFF OF PAYNE OKLA.

03/03/2022: FOREIGN SERVICE - TO SHERIFF OF PAYNE OKLA.

SUMMONS AND NOTICE OF AUTOMATIC TEMPORARY INJUNCTION SERVED - DONALD WEBB ON 3-3-2022 / PCSO

03/04/2022: SUMMONS AND NOTICE OF AUTOMATIC TEMPORARY INJUNCTION SERVED - DONALD WEBB ON 3-3-2022 / PCSO

ANSWER

03/10/2022: ANSWER

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: A; Description: ANSWER; Party: Webb, Donald Joe

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: RECEIPT # 2022-673818 ON 03/04/2022. PAYOR: TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 0.00. LINE ITEMS: FD-2022-15: $-48.50 ON TRANSFER FROM AC01 CLERK FEES. FD-2022-15: $48.50 ON TRANSFER TO AC08 SHERIFF FEES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: SNMS; Description: SUMMONS AND NOTICE OF AUTOMATIC TEMPORARY INJUNCTION SERVED - DONALD WEBB ON 3-3-2022 / PCSO; Party: Webb, Patsy Ann

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: RECEIPT # 2022-673719 ON 03/03/2022. PAYOR: WEBB/PATSY TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 60.00. LINE ITEMS: FD-2022-15: $58.50 ON AC01 CLERK FEES. FD-2022-15: $1.50 ON AC09 CARD ALLOCATIONS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: ADJUSTING ENTRY: MONIES DUE TO THE FOLLOWING AGENCIES REDUCED BY THE FOLLOWING AMOUNTS:FD-2022-15: AC01 CLERK FEES -$1.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketCode: ADJUST; Description: ADJUSTING ENTRY: MONIES DUE TO AC09-CARD ALLOCATION; Amount: $ 1.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: FSIN; Description: FOREIGN SERVICE - TO SHERIFF OF PAYNE OKLA.; Amount: $ 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketCode: SMF; Description: SUMMONS FEE (CLERKS FEE); Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: PA; Description: PAUPER'S AFFIDAVIT - JUDGE KISTLER; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office; Party: Webb, Patsy Ann

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OCIS HAS AUTOMATICALLY ASSIGNED JUDGE THOMAS, KATHERINE E. TO THIS CASE.

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; Amount: $ 183.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: DIVWOMC; Description: DIVORCE WITHOUT MINOR CHILDREN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FAMILY AND DOMESTIC INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: DIVORCE WITHOUT MINOR CHILDREN(DIVWOMC); Filed By: Webb, Patsy Ann; Disposed: Pending.

    Read MoreRead Less