This case was last updated from Rogers County Courts on 01/16/2023 at 17:28:18 (UTC).

In Re the marriage of Tammy L Merrill, Petitioner, v. Troy D Merrill, Respondent.

Case Summary

On 01/23/2020 In Re the marriage of Tammy L Merrill, Petitioner, filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Troy D Merrill, Respondent. This case was filed in Rogers County Courts, Rogers County Courthouse located in Statewide, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Crosson, Terrell S. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0-21

  • Filing Date:

    01/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Rogers, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Crosson, Terrell S

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Merrill, Tammy L

Respondent

Merrill, Troy D

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Higgins, William R

Attorney at Higgins & Easley Law, P.C.

417 West First Street, P.O. Box 1267

Claremore, OK 74017

Henson, Julie

Attorney at Baysinger Henson Reimer & Cresswell

8414 A N 123Rd E Ave

Owasso, OK 74055

Easley, Kevin A

Attorney at Higgins & Easley Law, P.C.

417 West First Street, P.O. Box 1267

Claremore, OK 74018

 

Court Documents

RESPONDENT'S ANSWER AND COUNTER-CLAIM

03/02/2020: RESPONDENT'S ANSWER AND COUNTER-CLAIM

PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

01/23/2020: PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND RESERVATION OF TIME TO PLEAD/WILLIAM HIGGINS AND KEVIN EASLEY FOR TROY MERRILL

02/25/2020: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND RESERVATION OF TIME TO PLEAD/WILLIAM HIGGINS AND KEVIN EASLEY FOR TROY MERRILL

PETITIONER'S APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS

01/23/2020: PETITIONER'S APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS

NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY DISCHARGE

07/10/2020: NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY DISCHARGE

AGREED DECREE OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

07/28/2020: AGREED DECREE OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

JUDGE CROSSON COMES ON FOR AGREED DECREE OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE. TESTIMONY BY AFFIDAVIT NO MINOR CHILDREN FAIR AND EQUITABLE DIVISION OF PROPERTY AND DEBT. DECREE ENTERED.

07/27/2020: JUDGE CROSSON COMES ON FOR AGREED DECREE OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE. TESTIMONY BY AFFIDAVIT NO MINOR CHILDREN FAIR AND EQUITABLE DIVISION OF PROPERTY AND DEBT. DECREE ENTERED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/28/2020
  • DispositionDisposition; Disposed: DIVORCE GRANTED (DECREE OR ORDER); Judge; Party Details

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: DDIV; Description: AGREED DECREE OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: CTFREE; Description: JUDGE CROSSON; COMES ON FOR AGREED DECREE OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE. TESTIMONY BY AFFIDAVIT; NO MINOR CHILDREN; FAIR AND EQUITABLE DIVISION OF PROPERTY AND DEBT. DECREE ENTERED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketCode: AFD; Description: JURISDUCTIONAL TESTIMONY AFFIDAVIT; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: NO; Description: NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY DISCHARGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: A; Description: RESPONDENT'S ANSWER AND COUNTER-CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: EAA; Description: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND RESERVATION OF TIME TO PLEAD/WILLIAM HIGGINS AND KEVIN EASLEY FOR TROY MERRILL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketCode: AFD; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (PPS / TROY D MERILL - PERSONAL SERVICE ON 2-5-2020); Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: RECEIPT # 2020-609385 ON 01/23/2020. PAYOR: BAYSINGER HENSON REIMER & CRESSWELL PLLC TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 272.14. LINE ITEMS: FD-2020-21: $193.00 ON AC01 CLERK FEES. FD-2020-21: $6.00 ON AC23 LAW LIBRARY FEE CIVIL AND CRIMINAL. FD-2020-21: $1.66 ON AC31 COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND. FD-2020-21: $5.00 ON AC58 OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES. FD-2020-21: $1.55 ON AC59 COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND. FD-2020-21: $7.00 ON AC64 DISPUTE MEDIATION FEES CIVIL ONLY. FD-2020-21: $0.45 ON AC65 STATE JUDICIAL REVOLVING FUND, INTERPRETER SVCS. FD-2020-21: $2.48 ON AC67 DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND. FD-2020-21: $25.00 ON AC79 OCIS REVOLVING FUND. FD-2020-21: $10.00 ON AC81 LENGTHY TRIAL FUND. FD-2020-21: $10.00 ON AC88 SHERIFFS SERVICE FEE FOR COURT HOUSE SECURITY. FD-2020-21: $10.00 ON AC89 COURT CLERK'S RECORDS MANAGEMENT AND PRESERVATION FEE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OCIS HAS AUTOMATICALLY ASSIGNED JUDGE CROSSON, TERRELL S TO THIS CASE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; Amount: $ 183.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketCode: DIVWOMC; Description: DIVORCE WITHOUT MINOR CHILDREN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FAMILY AND DOMESTIC INITIAL FILING.; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: DIVORCE WITHOUT MINOR CHILDREN(DIVWOMC); Filed By: Merrill, Tammy L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less