This case was last updated from Garfield County Courts on 07/25/2022 at 14:36:52 (UTC).

In Re the marriage of RACHEL ELAINE ROBERTS, Petitioner, and TYLER DENNIS JONES, Respondent.

Case Summary

On 01/18/2022 In Re the marriage of RACHEL ELAINE ROBERTS, Petitioner, and TYLER DENNIS JONES, Respondent was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Garfield County Courts, Garfield County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Seigars, Jason. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2-18

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Garfield, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Seigars, Jason

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ROBERTS, RACHEL ELAINE

Respondent

JONES, TYLER DENNIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

MCVAY, DALEN D

Attorney at MCVAY LAW FIRM PLLC

211 N. Washington

Enid, OK 73701

 

Court Documents

PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

01/18/2022: PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

WAIVER OF SUMMONS AND ENTRY OF APPEARANCE

03/15/2022: WAIVER OF SUMMONS AND ENTRY OF APPEARANCE

CERTIFICATE OF COMPLETION - RACHEL JONES

04/20/2022: CERTIFICATE OF COMPLETION - RACHEL JONES

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND REQUEST FOR NOTICE - DALEN MCVAY FOR PETITIONER

04/20/2022: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND REQUEST FOR NOTICE - DALEN MCVAY FOR PETITIONER

CERTIFICATE OF COMPLETION - TYLER JONES

07/05/2022: CERTIFICATE OF COMPLETION - TYLER JONES

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: CCOMP; Description: CERTIFICATE OF COMPLETION - TYLER JONES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: EAA; Description: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND REQUEST FOR NOTICE - DALEN MCVAY FOR PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: CCOMP; Description: CERTIFICATE OF COMPLETION - RACHEL JONES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: WA; Description: WAIVER OF SUMMONS AND ENTRY OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: RECEIPT # 2022-510615 ON 01/18/2022. PAYOR: JONES/RACHEL TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 252.14. LINE ITEMS: FD-2022-18: $178.46 ON AC01 CLERK FEES. FD-2022-18: $6.31 ON AC09 CARD ALLOCATIONS. FD-2022-18: $5.85 ON AC23 LAW LIBRARY FEE CIVIL AND CRIMINAL. FD-2022-18: $1.61 ON AC31 COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND. FD-2022-18: $4.87 ON AC58 OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES. FD-2022-18: $1.51 ON AC59 COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND. FD-2022-18: $6.82 ON AC64 DISPUTE MEDIATION FEES CIVIL ONLY. FD-2022-18: $0.43 ON AC65 STATE JUDICIAL REVOLVING FUND, INTERPRETER SVCS. FD-2022-18: $2.41 ON AC67 DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND. FD-2022-18: $24.37 ON AC79 OCIS REVOLVING FUND. FD-2022-18: $9.75 ON AC88 SHERIFFS SERVICE FEE FOR COURT HOUSE SECURITY. FD-2022-18: $9.75 ON AC89 COURT CLERK'S RECORDS MANAGEMENT AND PRESERVATION FEE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: ADJUSTING ENTRY: MONIES DUE TO THE FOLLOWING AGENCIES REDUCED BY THE FOLLOWING AMOUNTS:FD-2022-18: AC89 COURT CLERK'S RECORDS MANAGEMENT AND PRESERVATION FEE -$0.25FD-2022-18: AC88 SHERIFFS SERVICE FEE FOR COURT HOUSE SECURITY -$0.25FD-2022-18: AC79 OCIS REVOLVING FUND -$0.63FD-2022-18: AC67 DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND -$0.07FD-2022-18: AC65 STATE JUDICIAL REVOLVING FUND, INTERPRETER SVCS -$0.02FD-2022-18: AC64 DISPUTE MEDIATION FEES CIVIL ONLY -$0.18FD-2022-18: AC59 COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND -$0.04FD-2022-18: AC58 OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES -$0.13FD-2022-18: AC31 COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND -$0.05FD-2022-18: AC23 LAW LIBRARY FEE CIVIL AND CRIMINAL -$0.15FD-2022-18: AC01 CLERK FEES -$4.54

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCode: ADJUST; Description: ADJUSTING ENTRY: MONIES DUE TO AC09-CARD ALLOCATION; Amount: $ 6.31

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OCIS HAS AUTOMATICALLY ASSIGNED JUDGE SEIGARS, JASON TO THIS CASE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCode: CCADMIN04; Description: COURT CLERK ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON COLLECTIONS; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCode: CCRMPF; Description: COURT CLERK'S RECORDS MANAGEMENT AND PRESERVATION FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; Amount: $ 183.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCode: DIVMC; Description: DIVORCE WITH MINOR CHILDREN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FAMILY AND DOMESTIC INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: DIVORCE WITH MINOR CHILDREN(DIVMC); Filed By: ROBERTS, RACHEL ELAINE

    Read MoreRead Less