This case was last updated from Tulsa County Courts on 04/14/2022 at 17:49:35 (UTC).

In re the Marriage of: PAYNE, JULIE ANN and PAYNE, RONNIE JAMES

Case Summary

On 04/23/2021 In re the Marriage of PAYNE, JULIE ANN and PAYNE, RONNIE JAMES was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Tulsa County Courts, Tulsa County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1043

  • Filing Date:

    04/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Tulsa, Oklahoma

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PAYNE, JULIE ANN

Respondent

PAYNE, RONNIE JAMES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Wright, Kensey

Attorney at N Scott Johnson & Associates PLLC

302 East 10Th Street

Tulsa, OK 74119

Other Attorneys

BERNHARDT, KIRSTEN INGRID

401 S Boston Ave, Ste 500

Tulsa, OK 74103

 

Court Documents

PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

04/23/2021: PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

SUMMONS FEE

04/26/2021: SUMMONS FEE

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

05/03/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE

05/18/2021: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE - N. SCOTT JOHNSON - ATTORNEY FOR PETITIONER

06/09/2021: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE - N. SCOTT JOHNSON - ATTORNEY FOR PETITIONER

AMENDED PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND DECREE OF DIVORCE

06/09/2021: AMENDED PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND DECREE OF DIVORCE

ANSWER TO AMENDED PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION AND COUNTERCLAIM

06/17/2021: ANSWER TO AMENDED PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION AND COUNTERCLAIM

AFFIDAVIT OF JULIE ANN PAYNE

06/29/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF JULIE ANN PAYNE

AGREED DECREE OF DISSOLUTION

07/01/2021: AGREED DECREE OF DISSOLUTION

APPLICATION TO WITHDRAW AS ATTORNEY OR RECORD

08/06/2021: APPLICATION TO WITHDRAW AS ATTORNEY OR RECORD

ORDER PERMITTING WITHDRAWAL

09/01/2021: ORDER PERMITTING WITHDRAWAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: O; Description: ORDER PERMITTING WITHDRAWAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketCode: CTFREE; Description: HUBER, JAMES: ORDER PERMITTING WITHDRAWAL IS GRANTED AND SIGNED. KIRSTEN BERNHARDT ALLOWED TO WITHDRAW AS RESPONDENT'S ATTORNEY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: APLI; Description: APPLICATION TO WITHDRAW AS ATTORNEY OR RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DispositionDisposition; Disposed: DIVORCE GRANTED (DECREE OR ORDER); Other; Party Details; Respondent: PAYNE, RONNIE JAMES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: DDM; Description: AGREED DECREE OF DISSOLUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketCode: DISPDIV; Description: HUBER, JAMES: JURISDICTIONAL TESTIMONY AFFIDAVIT SUBMITTED. DIVORCE GRANTED, DECREE OF DISSOLUTION SIGNED AND ENTERED.; Count: 1; Party: PAYNE, RONNIE JAMES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF JULIE ANN PAYNE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: A; Description: ANSWER TO AMENDED PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION AND COUNTERCLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: P; Description: AMENDED PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND DECREE OF DIVORCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: EAA; Description: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE - N. SCOTT JOHNSON - ATTORNEY FOR PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; Amount: $ 183.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketCode: DIVWOMC; Description: DIVORCE WITHOUT MINOR CHILDREN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FAMILY AND DOMESTIC INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: DIVORCE WITHOUT MINOR CHILDREN(DIVWOMC); Filed By: PAYNE, JULIE ANN

    Read MoreRead Less