This case was last updated from Payne County Courts on 04/30/2022 at 16:11:25 (UTC).

In re the Marriage of: Matthews, Angel Marie and Matthews, Gary Dee

Case Summary

On 08/16/2018 In re the Marriage of Matthews, Angel Marie and Matthews, Gary Dee was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Payne County Courts, Payne County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Kulling, Michael. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-287

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Payne, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Kulling, Michael

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Matthews, Angel Marie

Respondent

MATTHEWS, GARY DEE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Webb, Sean Ryan

5608 Ne 107Th St.

Oklahoma City, OK 73151

 

Court Documents

TEMPORARY ORDER - WORTHINGTON

11/07/2018: TEMPORARY ORDER - WORTHINGTON

ORDER TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO PETITIONER'S "ADMISSIONS, INTEROGATORIES AND DOCUMENT REQUESTS" - KULLING

08/29/2019: ORDER TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO PETITIONER'S "ADMISSIONS, INTEROGATORIES AND DOCUMENT REQUESTS" - KULLING

MOTION TO WITHDRAW - JAMES MURRAY AND THOMAS SWAFFORD FOR RESPONDENT

05/10/2019: MOTION TO WITHDRAW - JAMES MURRAY AND THOMAS SWAFFORD FOR RESPONDENT

MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO PETITIONER'S "ADMISSIONS, INTERROGATORIES AND DOCUMENT REQUESTS" - PETITIONER

08/19/2019: MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO PETITIONER'S "ADMISSIONS, INTERROGATORIES AND DOCUMENT REQUESTS" - PETITIONER

NOTICE OF HEARING

05/10/2019: NOTICE OF HEARING

RESPONDENT'S ANSWER TO PETITIONER'S APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS, AND COUNTER APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS

08/31/2018: RESPONDENT'S ANSWER TO PETITIONER'S APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS, AND COUNTER APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS

PETITIONER'S UCCJEA AFFIDAVIT

08/16/2018: PETITIONER'S UCCJEA AFFIDAVIT

ORDER FOR HEARING

08/16/2018: ORDER FOR HEARING

NOTICE OF CHILD SUPPORT PROCEEDING

08/16/2018: NOTICE OF CHILD SUPPORT PROCEEDING

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2019
  • HearingEvent: Review; Petitioner's Motion for a Five Year Protective Order and Default Decree of Dissolution of Marriage; Party: Matthews,AngelMarie; Docket: Michael Kulling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DispositionDisposition; Disposed: DIVORCE GRANTED (DECREE OR ORDER); Judge; Party Details; Petitioner: Matthews, Angel Marie

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JUDGE KULLING: THE PETITIONER APPEARS IN PERSON AND WITH ATTORNEY, SEAN WEBB. THE RESPONDENT DOES NOT APPEAR. THE PETITIONER IS SWORN IN AND TESTIMONY IS HEARD. THE COURT FINDS IT HAD JURISDICTION OVER THE PARTIES AND SUBJECT MATTER, AND NOW BY DEFAULT GRANTS A DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE TO THE PARTIES, UPON THE GROUNDS OF INCOMPATIBILITY. THE DIVISION OF PROPERTY, DEBTS AND ASSETS ARE ALL APPROVED PURSUANT TO THE AGREEMENT OF THE PARTIES. ALL PURSUANT TO THE DECREE PRESENTED THIS DATE. THE COURT ALLOWS THE RESPONDENT TO RETURN TO HER FORMER NAME OF ANGEL MARIE SIMPSON.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: DECR; Description: DECREE OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE (JUDGE KULLING); Party: Matthews, Angel Marie

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • DocketCode: O; Description: ORDER FOR HEARING ON A FIVE YEAR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND A DEFAULT DECREE OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; Party: Matthews, Angel Marie

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • DocketCode: MO; Description: MOTION FOR A FIVE YEAR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND DEFAULT DECREE OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE - PETITIONER (ALSO IN PO-18-189); Party: Matthews, Angel Marie

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • HearingEvent: Petitioner's Notice of "Request for Admissions, Interrogatories and Document Requests; Party: Matthews,AngelMarie; Docket: Michael Kulling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: RECEIPT # 2019-613522 ON 08/29/2019. PAYOR: MATTHEWS/ANGEL TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 52.14. LINE ITEMS: FD-2018-287: $1.31 ON AC09 CARD ALLOCATIONS. FD-2018-287: $5.88 ON AC23 LAW LIBRARY FEE CIVIL AND CRIMINAL. FD-2018-287: $4.87 ON AC58 OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES. FD-2018-287: $1.51 ON AC59 COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND. FD-2018-287: $6.82 ON AC64 DISPUTE MEDIATION FEES CIVIL ONLY. FD-2018-287: $0.43 ON AC65 STATE JUDICIAL REVOLVING FUND, INTERPRETER SVCS. FD-2018-287: $2.41 ON AC67 DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND. FD-2018-287: $9.41 ON AC79 OCIS REVOLVING FUND. FD-2018-287: $9.75 ON AC81 LENGTHY TRIAL FUND. FD-2018-287: $9.75 ON AC88 SHERIFFS SERVICE FEE FOR COURT HOUSE SECURITY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: ADJUSTING ENTRY: MONIES DUE TO THE FOLLOWING AGENCIES REDUCED BY THE FOLLOWING AMOUNTS:FD-2018-287: AC88 SHERIFFS SERVICE FEE FOR COURT HOUSE SECURITY -$0.25FD-2018-287: AC81 LENGTHY TRIAL FUND -$0.25FD-2018-287: AC79 OCIS REVOLVING FUND -$0.25FD-2018-287: AC67 DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND -$0.07FD-2018-287: AC65 STATE JUDICIAL REVOLVING FUND, INTERPRETER SVCS -$0.02FD-2018-287: AC64 DISPUTE MEDIATION FEES CIVIL ONLY -$0.18FD-2018-287: AC59 COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND -$0.04FD-2018-287: AC58 OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES -$0.13FD-2018-287: AC23 LAW LIBRARY FEE CIVIL AND CRIMINAL -$0.12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • DocketCode: ADJUST; Description: ADJUSTING ENTRY: MONIES DUE TO AC09-CARD ALLOCATION; Amount: $ 1.31

    Read MoreRead Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 08/16/2018
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; Amount: $ 183.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • DocketCode: DIVMC; Description: DIVORCE WITH MINOR CHILDREN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FAMILY AND DOMESTIC INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: DIVORCE WITH MINOR CHILDREN(DIVMC); Filed By: Matthews, Angel Marie

    Read MoreRead Less