This case was last updated from Oklahoma County Courts on 01/15/2023 at 23:01:58 (UTC).

In Re the marriage of Liliana Arellano Loera, Petitioner, v. Adam Faulkner, Respondent.

Case Summary

On 01/21/2020 In Re the marriage of Liliana Arellano Loera, Petitioner, filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Adam Faulkner, Respondent. This case was filed in Oklahoma County Courts, Oklahoma County Courthouse located in Statewide, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Ryan, Gregory J. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-207

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Oklahoma, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Ryan, Gregory J

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Loera, Liliana Arellano

Respondent

Faulkner, Adam

 

Court Documents

STATUS REPORT

01/21/2020: STATUS REPORT

JOINT CUSTODY AFFIDAVIT OF PETITIONER

01/21/2020: JOINT CUSTODY AFFIDAVIT OF PETITIONER

PETITIONER'S UCCJEA AFFIDAVIT

01/21/2020: PETITIONER'S UCCJEA AFFIDAVIT

SUMMONS AND NOTCE OF AUTOMATIC TEMPORARY INJUCTION RETURNED, UNSERVED: ADAM FAULKNER - NOT SERVED - ON 12-8-20

12/10/2020: SUMMONS AND NOTCE OF AUTOMATIC TEMPORARY INJUCTION RETURNED, UNSERVED: ADAM FAULKNER - NOT SERVED - ON 12-8-20

CSS'S ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND NOTICE OF NECESSARY PARTY

02/19/2021: CSS'S ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND NOTICE OF NECESSARY PARTY

APPLICATION TO AUTHORIZE SERVICE BY PUBLICATION

03/09/2022: APPLICATION TO AUTHORIZE SERVICE BY PUBLICATION

NOTICE BY PUBLICATION

03/16/2022: NOTICE BY PUBLICATION

ORDER AUTHORIZING SERVICE BY PUBLICATION

03/16/2022: ORDER AUTHORIZING SERVICE BY PUBLICATION

PROOF OF PUBLICATION/OKC FRIDAY $54.66 PAID

04/18/2022: PROOF OF PUBLICATION/OKC FRIDAY $54.66 PAID

MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

05/18/2022: MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

DIVORCE IMPACT EDUCATIONAL PROGRAM COMPLETION

08/17/2022: DIVORCE IMPACT EDUCATIONAL PROGRAM COMPLETION

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JUDGE REASSIGNMENT - HD#138691

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • HearingEvent: MOTOIN FOR DEFAULT JUDGEMENT; Docket: Gregory J Ryan

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DispositionDisposition; Disposed: DIVORCE GRANTED (DECREE OR ORDER); Judge; Party Details; Petitioner: Loera, Liliana Arellano

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: DIEPC; Description: DIVORCE IMPACT EDUCATIONAL PROGRAM COMPLETION; Party: Loera, Liliana Arellano

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketCode: DDM; Description: DECREE OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketCode: DISPDIV; Description: JUDGE RYAN: CHIEF WAIVER DOCKET- PLAIN APPEARS PRO-SE WITH INTERPETER MS VIELLO AND LEGAL AID MR. SARGENT. RESPONDENT NOT PRESENT, WITNESSES SWORN, TESTIMONY TAKEN, DISSOLUTION GRANTED.; Count: 1; Party: Loera, Liliana Arellano

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketCode: CTFREE; Description: JUDGE HAFAR: CHIEF WAIVER DOCKET - PETITIONER APPEARS PRO SE. TESTIMONY TAKEN. REFERRED TO CLINIC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: MO; Description: MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PP; Description: PROOF OF PUBLICATION/OKC FRIDAY $54.66 PAID

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketCode: DISBURSED; Description: VOUCHER# 433819 PRINTED TO OKC FRIDAY, WHICH INCLUDES $ 54.11 FROM THIS CASE FOR AC40 - PUBLICATION PAYMENT RECEIVED - CIVIL AND CRIMINAL. TOTAL AMOUNT OF VOUCHER: $ 200.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 183.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCode: DIVMC; Description: DIVORCE WITH MINOR CHILDREN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FAMILY AND DOMESTIC INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: DIVORCE WITH MINOR CHILDREN(DIVMC); Filed By: Loera, Liliana Arellano

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less