This case was last updated from Rogers County Courts on 01/17/2023 at 05:48:07 (UTC).

In Re the marriage of Levi Green, Petitioner, v. Chandler Green, Respondent.

Case Summary

On 01/24/2020 In Re the marriage of Levi Green, Petitioner, filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Chandler Green, Respondent. This case was filed in Rogers County Courts, Rogers County Courthouse located in Statewide, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Crosson, Terrell S. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0-22

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Rogers, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Crosson, Terrell S

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Green, Levi

Respondent

Green, Chandler

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Sanbrano, Jenny

Attorney at Rahmeier & Sanbrano

210 South Florence, P. O. Box 767

Claremore, OK 74018

Respondent Attorney

McKenna, Gregory R

Attorney at M Keith Stitt & Associates

2761 East Skelly Drive, Suite 100

Tulsa, OK 74105

Other Attorneys

Tarvin, Matthew R

Attorney at Greer and Tarvin PLLC

418 West 4Th Street

Claremore, OK 74017

 

Court Documents

MOTION FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL

10/09/2020: MOTION FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL

ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO WITHDRAW

10/21/2020: ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO WITHDRAW

CERTIFICATE OF COMPLETION FOR A SEMINAR FOR DIVORCING PARENTS (LEVI GREEN)

06/22/2020: CERTIFICATE OF COMPLETION FOR A SEMINAR FOR DIVORCING PARENTS (LEVI GREEN)

JUDGE CROSSON JENNY SANBRANO REPRESENTS PETITIONER JUSTIN GREER REPRESENTS RESPONDENT. JURISDICTIONAL AFFIDAVIT SUBMITTED, FAIR AND EQUITABLE DIVISION OF PROPERTY AND DEBT, NO SUPPORT ALIMONY, DEVIATION FROM CHILD SUPPORT GUIDELINES BY AGREMENT, BEST

09/24/2020: JUDGE CROSSON JENNY SANBRANO REPRESENTS PETITIONER JUSTIN GREER REPRESENTS RESPONDENT. JURISDICTIONAL AFFIDAVIT SUBMITTED, FAIR AND EQUITABLE DIVISION OF PROPERTY AND DEBT, NO SUPPORT ALIMONY, DEVIATION FROM CHILD SUPPORT GUIDELINES BY AGREMENT, BEST INTEREST OF CHILD. DIVORCE GRANTED, DECREE ENTERED.

JUDGE CROSSON CR: MARTINEZ CASE COMES ON FOR MOTION FOR ORDER REGARDING SCHOOL & RESPONDENTS MOTION TO APPOINT PARENTING COORDINATOR. ATTY JENNY SANBRANO PRESENT WITH PETITIONER ATTY BEN AUSSENBURG PRESENT WITH RESPONDENT. SWORN. HEARING HELD ON MOTI

08/17/2022: JUDGE CROSSON CR: MARTINEZ CASE COMES ON FOR MOTION FOR ORDER REGARDING SCHOOL & RESPONDENTS MOTION TO APPOINT PARENTING COORDINATOR. ATTY JENNY SANBRANO PRESENT WITH PETITIONER ATTY BEN AUSSENBURG PRESENT WITH RESPONDENT. SWORN. HEARING HELD ON MOTIONS. PARTIES AGREE TO PC.ATTY AUSSENBURG TO PREPARE JOURNAL ENTRY ON MOTION FOR PARENTING COORDINATOR. ARGUMENTS HEARD ON MOTION FOR ORDER REGARDING SCHOOL. MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT OVERRULED. TESTIMONIES HEARD. CLOSING ARGUMENTS MADE. COURT ORDERS: BASED UPON EVIDENCE. COURT FINDS IT IS IN THE BEST INTEREST THAT THE CHILD ATTEND PRE-K IN SEQUOYAH. COURT ORDERS FOR THE NEXT TWO WEEKS ON RESPONDENT'S WEEKS THAT THE PETITIONER ARRANGE FOR AFTER SCHOOL CARE UNTIL RESPONDENT CAN GET AFTER SCHOOL CARE ARRANGEMENTS IN PLACE. ATTY SANBRANO TO PREPARE JOURNAL ENTRY.

CERTIFICATE OF DELIVERY

08/11/2022: CERTIFICATE OF DELIVERY

ORDER AND NOTICE OF EXPEDITED HEARING

08/09/2022: ORDER AND NOTICE OF EXPEDITED HEARING

ORDER SETTING HEARING

07/27/2022: ORDER SETTING HEARING

PETITIONER'S RESPONSE TO RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO APPOINT PARENTING COORDINATOR AND COUNTER MOTION TO APPOINT PARENTING COORDINATOR

07/22/2022: PETITIONER'S RESPONSE TO RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO APPOINT PARENTING COORDINATOR AND COUNTER MOTION TO APPOINT PARENTING COORDINATOR

ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

06/21/2022: ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

APPLICATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

06/16/2022: APPLICATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE/JENNY SANBRANO FOR PETITIONER

04/18/2022: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE/JENNY SANBRANO FOR PETITIONER

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketCode: AGORD; Description: AGREED ORDER APPOINTING PARENTING COORDINATOR; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • HearingEvent: MOTION FOR ORDER REGARDING SCHOOL; Docket: Terrell S Crosson

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • HearingEvent: RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO APPOINT PARENTING COORDINATOR; Docket: Terrell S Crosson

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: RECEIPT # 2022-671404 ON 08/17/2022. PAYOR: GREEN/LEVI TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 20.00. LINE ITEMS: FD-2020-22: $19.50 ON AC01 CLERK FEES. FD-2020-22: $0.50 ON AC09 CARD ALLOCATIONS.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: ADJUSTING ENTRY: MONIES DUE TO THE FOLLOWING AGENCIES REDUCED BY THE FOLLOWING AMOUNTS:FD-2020-22: AC01 CLERK FEES -$0.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketCode: ADJUST; Description: ADJUSTING ENTRY: MONIES DUE TO AC09-CARD ALLOCATION; Amount: $ 0.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: CTFREE; Description: JUDGE CROSSON; CR: MARTINEZ; CASE COMES ON FOR MOTION FOR ORDER REGARDING SCHOOL & RESPONDENTS MOTION TO APPOINT PARENTING COORDINATOR. ATTY JENNY SANBRANO PRESENT WITH PETITIONER; ATTY BEN AUSSENBURG PRESENT WITH RESPONDENT. SWORN. HEARING HELD ON MOTIONS. PARTIES AGREE TO PC.ATTY AUSSENBURG TO PREPARE JOURNAL ENTRY ON MOTION FOR PARENTING COORDINATOR. ARGUMENTS HEARD ON MOTION FOR ORDER REGARDING SCHOOL. MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT OVERRULED. TESTIMONIES HEARD. CLOSING ARGUMENTS MADE. COURT ORDERS: BASED UPON EVIDENCE. COURT FINDS IT IS IN THE BEST INTEREST THAT THE CHILD ATTEND PRE-K IN SEQUOYAH. COURT ORDERS FOR THE NEXT TWO WEEKS ON RESPONDENT'S WEEKS THAT THE PETITIONER ARRANGE FOR AFTER SCHOOL CARE UNTIL RESPONDENT CAN GET AFTER SCHOOL CARE ARRANGEMENTS IN PLACE. ATTY SANBRANO TO PREPARE JOURNAL ENTRY.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketCode: CRF; Description: COURT REPORTER FEE; Amount: $ 20.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: RECEIPT # 2022-671071 ON 08/11/2022. PAYOR: GREEN, LEVI TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 76.64. LINE ITEMS: FD-2020-22: $33.00 ON AC01 CLERK FEES. FD-2020-22: $0.66 ON AC31 COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND. FD-2020-22: $5.00 ON AC58 OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES. FD-2020-22: $1.55 ON AC59 COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND. FD-2020-22: $0.45 ON AC65 STATE JUDICIAL REVOLVING FUND, INTERPRETER SVCS. FD-2020-22: $0.98 ON AC67 DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND. FD-2020-22: $25.00 ON AC79 OCIS REVOLVING FUND. FD-2020-22: $10.00 ON AC89 COURT CLERK'S RECORDS MANAGEMENT AND PRESERVATION FEE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: CER; Description: CERTIFICATE OF DELIVERY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
54 More Docket Entries
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office; Amount: $ 183.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketCode: DIVMC; Description: DIVORCE WITH MINOR CHILDREN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FAMILY AND DOMESTIC INITIAL FILING.; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: DIVORCE WITH MINOR CHILDREN(DIVMC); Filed By: Green, Levi

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less