This case was last updated from Canadian County Courts on 05/22/2022 at 06:46:41 (UTC).

In Re the marriage of KEVIN RAY STOKES, Petitioner, v. CANDICE DAWN STOKES, Respondent.

Case Summary

On 01/27/2021 In Re the marriage of KEVIN RAY STOKES, Petitioner filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against CANDICE DAWN STOKES, Respondent. This case was filed in Canadian County Courts, Canadian County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Hatfield, Barbara. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1-42

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Canadian, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Hatfield, Barbara

 

Party Details

Petitioner

STOKES, KEVIN RAY

Respondent

STOKES, CANDICE DAWN

Interested Parties

CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES

DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

OSBY, MARK W

Attorney at WHEATLEY SEGLER & OSBY LLC

Po Box 850126

Yukon, OK 73085

Interested Party Attorney

DILLARD-SELF, STACIE R

Po Box 851432

Yukon, OK 73085

 

Court Documents

ORDER ACCEPTING TRANSFER//FILED

01/27/2021: ORDER ACCEPTING TRANSFER//FILED

FAMILY AND DOMESTIC INITIAL FILING.//MOTION FOR ORDER ACCEPTING AND TRANSFERRING JURISDICTION AND VENUE/FILED

01/27/2021: FAMILY AND DOMESTIC INITIAL FILING.//MOTION FOR ORDER ACCEPTING AND TRANSFERRING JURISDICTION AND VENUE/FILED

RESPONSE TO RESPONDENT'S APPLICATION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS//FILED COPY GIVEN TO JUDGE

04/07/2022: RESPONSE TO RESPONDENT'S APPLICATION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS//FILED COPY GIVEN TO JUDGE

RESPONDENT'S APPLICATION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS//FILED

03/24/2022: RESPONDENT'S APPLICATION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS//FILED

AGREED ORDER OF MODIFICATION//FILED

02/22/2022: AGREED ORDER OF MODIFICATION//FILED

MOTION TO ENTER ON NON-JURY DOCKET//FILED

10/18/2021: MOTION TO ENTER ON NON-JURY DOCKET//FILED

RESPONDENT'S RESPONSE TO PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM/FILED

06/23/2021: RESPONDENT'S RESPONSE TO PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM/FILED

MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT GUARDIAN AD LITEM//FILED

05/26/2021: MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT GUARDIAN AD LITEM//FILED

RESPONSE TO RESPONDENT'S COUNTER MOTION TO MODIFY//FILED

05/26/2021: RESPONSE TO RESPONDENT'S COUNTER MOTION TO MODIFY//FILED

RESPONDENT'S RESPONSE TO PETITIONER'S MOTION TO MODIFY DECREE OF DIVORCE AND DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND RESPONDENT'S COUNTER MOTION TO MODIFY//FILED

05/12/2021: RESPONDENT'S RESPONSE TO PETITIONER'S MOTION TO MODIFY DECREE OF DIVORCE AND DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND RESPONDENT'S COUNTER MOTION TO MODIFY//FILED

ORDER SETTING HEARING FILED

04/09/2021: ORDER SETTING HEARING FILED

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE FILED 9-15-2020 // FILED

04/09/2021: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE FILED 9-15-2020 // FILED

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED 3-25-2020 // FILED

04/09/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED 3-25-2020 // FILED

RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE FILED 3-20-2020 // FILED

04/09/2021: RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE FILED 3-20-2020 // FILED

MOTION TO MODIFY DECREE OF DIVORCE AND DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE FILED 2-18-2020// FILED

04/09/2021: MOTION TO MODIFY DECREE OF DIVORCE AND DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE FILED 2-18-2020// FILED

NOTICE OF HEARING FILED 2-18-2020 // FILED

04/09/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING FILED 2-18-2020 // FILED

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE FILED 2-18-2020 // FILED

04/09/2021: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE FILED 2-18-2020 // FILED

PETITION TO MODIFY DECREE TO ADDRESS NEWLY DISCOVERED DEBT FILED 2-18-2020 // FILED

04/09/2021: PETITION TO MODIFY DECREE TO ADDRESS NEWLY DISCOVERED DEBT FILED 2-18-2020 // FILED

41 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2022
  • HearingEvent: R's APPLICATION FOR ATTORNEY FEES; Docket: Barbara Hatfield

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • HearingEvent: R's APPLICATION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES; CONTD TO 06-13-22; Docket: Barbara Hatfield

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: RESP; Description: RESPONSE TO RESPONDENT'S APPLICATION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS//FILED COPY GIVEN TO JUDGE; Party: STOKES, KEVIN RAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: APLI; Description: RESPONDENT'S APPLICATION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS//FILED; Party: STOKES, CANDICE DAWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • HearingEvent: Res-MTM Custody, Vis. & C.S.; Docket: Barbara Hatfield

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • HearingEvent: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Docket: Barbara Hatfield

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketCode: CTFREE; Description: CRT MIN. MATTER CAME ON THIS DAY FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. MARK OSBY, ATTORNEY FOR THE RESPONDENT, ADVISES THE COURT THIS MATTER HAS BEEN SETTLED IN FULL AND AN AGREED DECREE SHALL BE CIRCULATED. JUDGE HATFIELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: AGORD; Description: AGREED ORDER OF MODIFICATION//FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • HearingEvent: Res-MTE; Docket: Barbara Hatfield

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: MO; Description: MOTION TO ENTER ON NON-JURY DOCKET//FILED; Party: STOKES, CANDICE DAWN

    Read MoreRead Less
62 More Docket Entries
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 183.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketCode: DIVMC; Description: DIVORCE WITH MINOR CHILDREN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FAMILY AND DOMESTIC INITIAL FILING.//MOTION FOR ORDER ACCEPTING AND TRANSFERRING JURISDICTION AND VENUE/FILED; Count: 1; Party: STOKES, CANDICE DAWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: DIVORCE WITH MINOR CHILDREN(DIVMC); Filed By: STOKES, KEVIN RAY

    Read MoreRead Less