This case was last updated from Canadian County Courts on 05/22/2022 at 03:18:24 (UTC).

In Re the marriage of KARISSA L. NALL, Petitioner, v. DERRICK J. VOGEL, Respondent.

Case Summary

On 03/29/2021 In Re the marriage of KARISSA L NALL, Petitioner filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against DERRICK J VOGEL, Respondent. This case was filed in Canadian County Courts, Canadian County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Gass, Charles. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-167

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Canadian, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Gass, Charles

 

Party Details

Petitioner

NALL, KARISSA L.

Respondent

VOGEL, DERRICK J.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BUMGARNER, RANDY LEE

101 Park Avenue, Suite 410

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Respondent Attorney

ERBAR, MARIA TULLY

The Oil Center Suite 1025W, 2601 Nw Expressway

Oklahoma City, OK 73112

 

Court Documents

SIGNATURE PAGE FOR HAND DELIVERY OF PARENTING CLASSES // FILED

03/29/2021: SIGNATURE PAGE FOR HAND DELIVERY OF PARENTING CLASSES // FILED

COPY OF ORIGINAL SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED // FILED

03/30/2021: COPY OF ORIGINAL SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED // FILED

PETITIONER'S APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY ORDER // FILED

03/29/2021: PETITIONER'S APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY ORDER // FILED

NOTICE OF HEARING // FILED

03/29/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING // FILED

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE // FILED

03/29/2021: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE // FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE

03/29/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE

FAMILY AND DOMESTIC INITIAL FILING. // PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE // FILED

03/29/2021: FAMILY AND DOMESTIC INITIAL FILING. // PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE // FILED

ORDER ALLOWING ATTORNEY TO WITHDRAW//FILED

05/17/2022: ORDER ALLOWING ATTORNEY TO WITHDRAW//FILED

ORDER ALLOWING ATTORNEY TO WITHDRAW//FILED

05/05/2022: ORDER ALLOWING ATTORNEY TO WITHDRAW//FILED

NOTICE OF HEARING//FILED

05/02/2022: NOTICE OF HEARING//FILED

PETITIONER'S MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO FIRST DISCOVERY REQUESTS TO RESPONDENT//FILED

05/02/2022: PETITIONER'S MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO FIRST DISCOVERY REQUESTS TO RESPONDENT//FILED

PETITIONER'S AMENDED MOTION TO MODIFY TEMPORARY ORDER//FILED

05/02/2022: PETITIONER'S AMENDED MOTION TO MODIFY TEMPORARY ORDER//FILED

PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR ORDER TO APPRAISAL MARITAL HOME AND MOTION TO ORDER TO SELL MARITIAL HOMA OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE REFINANCE//FILED

04/26/2022: PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR ORDER TO APPRAISAL MARITAL HOME AND MOTION TO ORDER TO SELL MARITIAL HOMA OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE REFINANCE//FILED

PETITIONER'S MOTION TO MODIFY TEMPORARY ORDER//FILED

04/26/2022: PETITIONER'S MOTION TO MODIFY TEMPORARY ORDER//FILED

MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSE TO SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOYERY REQUESTS//FILED

03/02/2022: MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSE TO SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOYERY REQUESTS//FILED

RESPONDENT'S RESPONSE TO MOTION TO APPOINT GUARDIAN AD LITEM/FILED

02/10/2022: RESPONDENT'S RESPONSE TO MOTION TO APPOINT GUARDIAN AD LITEM/FILED

NOTICE OF HEARING FILED

01/18/2022: NOTICE OF HEARING FILED

PETITIONERS MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FILED

01/18/2022: PETITIONERS MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FILED

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2022
  • HearingEvent: MOTION FOR GAL / RESPONDENTS MOTION TO COMPEL, PET. MOTION TO MODIFY TO, PET. MOTION FOR ORDER TO APPRAISAL MARITAL HOME; Docket: Charles Gass

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: OAWD; Description: ORDER ALLOWING ATTORNEY TO WITHDRAW//FILED; Party: VOGEL, DERRICK J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: OAWD; Description: ORDER ALLOWING ATTORNEY TO WITHDRAW//FILED; Party: VOGEL, DERRICK J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: NOH; Description: NOTICE OF HEARING//FILED; Party: NALL, KARISSA L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: MOC; Description: PETITIONER'S MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO FIRST DISCOVERY REQUESTS TO RESPONDENT//FILED; Party: NALL, KARISSA L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: AM; Description: PETITIONER'S AMENDED MOTION TO MODIFY TEMPORARY ORDER//FILED; Party: NALL, KARISSA L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: MO; Description: PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR ORDER TO APPRAISAL MARITAL HOME AND MOTION TO ORDER TO SELL MARITIAL HOMA OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE REFINANCE//FILED; Party: NALL, KARISSA L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: MO; Description: PETITIONER'S MOTION TO MODIFY TEMPORARY ORDER//FILED; Party: NALL, KARISSA L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • HearingEvent: MOTION FOR GAL & RESP. MOTION TO COMPEL *STRICKEN AND CONTINED TO 06-10-22 9AM*; Docket: Charles Gass

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • HearingEvent: MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY REQUEST *STRICKEN*; Docket: Charles Gass

    Read MoreRead Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 183.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketCode: DIVMC; Description: DIVORCE WITH MINOR CHILDREN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FAMILY AND DOMESTIC INITIAL FILING. // PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE // FILED; Count: 1; Party: NALL, KARISSA L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: DIVORCE WITH MINOR CHILDREN(DIVMC); Filed By: NALL, KARISSA L.

    Read MoreRead Less