This case was last updated from Canadian County Courts on 06/28/2022 at 13:38:50 (UTC).

In Re the marriage of KEVIN BRYAN JOURNEAY, Petitioner, v. JENNIFER SHARI ANN JOURNEAY, Respondent.

Case Summary

On 01/20/2022 In Re the marriage of KEVIN BRYAN JOURNEAY, Petitioner filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against JENNIFER SHARI ANN JOURNEAY, Respondent. This case was filed in Canadian County Courts, Canadian County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Gass, Charles. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2-35

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Canadian, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Gass, Charles

 

Party Details

Petitioner

JOURNEAY, KEVIN BRYAN

Respondent

JOURNEAY, JENNIFER SHARI ANN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

WISE, MATTHEW TATE

2201 Mckown, Suite #3

Norman, OK 73072

 

Court Documents

FAMILY AND DOMESTIC INITIAL FILING. PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE FILED

01/20/2022: FAMILY AND DOMESTIC INITIAL FILING. PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE FILED

SIGNATURE PAGE FOR HAND DELIVERY OF PARENTING CLASSES FILED

01/20/2022: SIGNATURE PAGE FOR HAND DELIVERY OF PARENTING CLASSES FILED

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE//FILED

04/13/2022: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE//FILED

APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY ORDER//FILED

05/05/2022: APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY ORDER//FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2022
  • HearingEvent: HEARING ON APPLICATION FOR TO; Party: JOURNEAY,KEVINBRYAN; Docket: Charles Gass

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: APTO; Description: APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY ORDER//FILED; Party: JOURNEAY, KEVIN BRYAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: EAA; Description: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE//FILED; Party: JOURNEAY, KEVIN BRYAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: RECEIPT # 2022-691749 ON 01/20/2022. PAYOR: JOURNEAY/KEVIN TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 249.64. LINE ITEMS: FD-2022-35: $178.45 ON AC01 CLERK FEES. FD-2022-35: $6.25 ON AC09 CARD ALLOCATIONS. FD-2022-35: $5.85 ON AC23 LAW LIBRARY FEE CIVIL AND CRIMINAL. FD-2022-35: $0.64 ON AC31 COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND. FD-2022-35: $4.87 ON AC58 OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES. FD-2022-35: $1.51 ON AC59 COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND. FD-2022-35: $6.82 ON AC64 DISPUTE MEDIATION FEES CIVIL ONLY. FD-2022-35: $0.43 ON AC65 STATE JUDICIAL REVOLVING FUND, INTERPRETER SVCS. FD-2022-35: $0.95 ON AC67 DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND. FD-2022-35: $24.37 ON AC79 OCIS REVOLVING FUND. FD-2022-35: $9.75 ON AC81 LENGTHY TRIAL FUND. FD-2022-35: $9.75 ON AC89 COURT CLERK'S RECORDS MANAGEMENT AND PRESERVATION FEE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: ADJUSTING ENTRY: MONIES DUE TO THE FOLLOWING AGENCIES REDUCED BY THE FOLLOWING AMOUNTS:FD-2022-35: AC89 COURT CLERK'S RECORDS MANAGEMENT AND PRESERVATION FEE -$0.25FD-2022-35: AC81 LENGTHY TRIAL FUND -$0.25FD-2022-35: AC79 OCIS REVOLVING FUND -$0.63FD-2022-35: AC67 DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND -$0.03FD-2022-35: AC65 STATE JUDICIAL REVOLVING FUND, INTERPRETER SVCS -$0.02FD-2022-35: AC64 DISPUTE MEDIATION FEES CIVIL ONLY -$0.18FD-2022-35: AC59 COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND -$0.04FD-2022-35: AC58 OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES -$0.13FD-2022-35: AC31 COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND -$0.02FD-2022-35: AC23 LAW LIBRARY FEE CIVIL AND CRIMINAL -$0.15FD-2022-35: AC01 CLERK FEES -$4.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: ADJUST; Description: ADJUSTING ENTRY: MONIES DUE TO AC09-CARD ALLOCATION; Amount: $ 6.25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OCIS HAS AUTOMATICALLY ASSIGNED JUDGE GASS, CHARLES TO THIS CASE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SIGNATURE PAGE FOR HAND DELIVERY OF PARENTING CLASSES FILED; Party: JOURNEAY, KEVIN BRYAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: LTF; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: CCADMIN04; Description: COURT CLERK ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON COLLECTIONS; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 183.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: DIVMC; Description: DIVORCE WITH MINOR CHILDREN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FAMILY AND DOMESTIC INITIAL FILING. PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE FILED; Count: 1; Party: JOURNEAY, KEVIN BRYAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: DIVORCE WITH MINOR CHILDREN(DIVMC); Filed By: JOURNEAY, KEVIN BRYAN

    Read MoreRead Less