This case was last updated from Garfield County Courts on 05/24/2022 at 06:47:12 (UTC).

IN RE THE MARRIAGE OF: JOSE ACOSTA VAZQUES, Petitioner, -and- FABIOLA ACOSTA LOPEZ, Respondent.

Case Summary

On 01/20/2022 IN RE THE MARRIAGE OF JOSE ACOSTA VAZQUES, Petitioner, -and- FABIOLA ACOSTA LOPEZ, Respondent was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Garfield County Courts, Garfield County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Hladik, Dennis. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2-20

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Garfield, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Hladik, Dennis

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ACOSTA, ARTURO

Respondent

LOPEZ, FABIOLA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

MCVAY, DALEN D

Attorney at MCVAY LAW FIRM PLLC

211 N. Washington

Enid, OK 73701

LONG, RANDY J

Attorney at Long, Claypole& Blakley Law, PLC

Po Box 3623

Enid, OK 73702

 

Court Documents

PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

01/20/2022: PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE - RANDY LONG FOR PETITIONER

01/20/2022: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE - RANDY LONG FOR PETITIONER

SUMMONS AND NOTICE OF AUTOMATIC TEMPORARY INJUNCTION ISSUED - PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER

01/20/2022: SUMMONS AND NOTICE OF AUTOMATIC TEMPORARY INJUNCTION ISSUED - PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER

SUMMONS AND NOTICE OF AUTOMATIC TEMPORARY INJUNCTION SERVED - FABIOLA LOPEZ PERSONALLY 1/25/22

01/28/2022: SUMMONS AND NOTICE OF AUTOMATIC TEMPORARY INJUNCTION SERVED - FABIOLA LOPEZ PERSONALLY 1/25/22

MOTION FOR HAIR FOLLICLE AND/OR NAIL BED TESTING

01/28/2022: MOTION FOR HAIR FOLLICLE AND/OR NAIL BED TESTING

APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS

01/28/2022: APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS

ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIM

01/28/2022: ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIM

MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD

02/02/2022: MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND REQUEST FOR NOTICE DALEN MCVAY FOR JOSE ACOSTA

02/09/2022: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND REQUEST FOR NOTICE DALEN MCVAY FOR JOSE ACOSTA

ANSWER TO RESPONDENT'S COUNTERCLAIM

02/11/2022: ANSWER TO RESPONDENT'S COUNTERCLAIM

OBJECTION TO MOTION FOR HAIR FOLLICLE AND/OR NAIL BED TESTING

02/11/2022: OBJECTION TO MOTION FOR HAIR FOLLICLE AND/OR NAIL BED TESTING

RESPONSE TO RESPONDENT'S APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY ORDER

02/11/2022: RESPONSE TO RESPONDENT'S APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY ORDER

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketCode: CTFREE; Description: JUDGE HLADIK: BENCH DKT: MCVAY & GUNGOLL; PARTIES ORDERED TO MEDIATE BY JUNE 1; TRIAL 6-23-22, 9 AM; IF PARTIES FAIL TO MEDIATE BY JUNE 1, TRIAL WILL BE STRICKEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketCode: CTFREE; Description: JUDGE HLADIK: BENCH DKT: DALEN MCVAY/GUNGOLL; AGREED T.O.: TEMP CUSTODY TO W; H - FRI 6 - SUN 6, ALT HOLIDAYS, EMPLOYEES OF THEIR CONST CO WILL ASSIST IN COMMUNICATION & VISITATION EXAHANGE RE: KIDS EXCHANGE @ EPD; CONTINUE PO - C/S PER GUIDLINES, INCOMES YET TO BE DETERMINED; H = WILL HAVE TEMP POSS OF THE BUSINESS, H TEMP TRAILER & SHOP; WIFE - RESIDENCE + INCOME FROM 2 RENTALS; 2008 EXPEDITION & SILVERADO TO W; H WILL KEEP CONV. VEHICLES; PROPER CONDUCT, - W/NO OVERNIGHT GUESTS; H PROHIBTED USING DRUGS OR OH WHEN KIDS IN POSSESSION; IF W OR KIDS OBSERVE DRUGS OR OH, W MAY TEMP SUSPEND VISITATION S/L/A SHE FILES ACTION IN CT W/IN 5 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: RESP; Description: RESPONSE TO RESPONDENT'S APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: OBJ; Description: OBJECTION TO MOTION FOR HAIR FOLLICLE AND/OR NAIL BED TESTING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: A; Description: ANSWER TO RESPONDENT'S COUNTERCLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: EAA; Description: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND REQUEST FOR NOTICE DALEN MCVAY FOR JOSE ACOSTA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: MO; Description: MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: A; Description: ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: APTO; Description: APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: MO; Description: MOTION FOR HAIR FOLLICLE AND/OR NAIL BED TESTING

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; Amount: $ 183.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: DIVMC; Description: DIVORCE WITH MINOR CHILDREN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FAMILY AND DOMESTIC INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: DIVORCE WITH MINOR CHILDREN(DIVMC); Filed By: ACOSTA, ARTURO

    Read MoreRead Less