This case was last updated from Garfield County Courts on 06/24/2022 at 02:40:08 (UTC).

In Re the marriage of JESSICA CENOBIO, Petitioner, And BERNABE CENOBIO ROBLES, Respondent.

Case Summary

On 01/18/2022 In Re the marriage of JESSICA CENOBIO, Petitioner, And BERNABE CENOBIO ROBLES, Respondent was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Garfield County Courts, Garfield County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Seigars, Jason. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2-19

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Garfield, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Seigars, Jason

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CENOBIO, JESSICA L

Respondent

CENOBIO, BERNABE ROBLES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

LAMUNYON, JUSTIN

Attorney at LAMUNYON LAW FIRM PC

118 N Independence

Enid, OK 73701

 

Court Documents

PETITION

01/18/2022: PETITION

SUMMONS AND NOTICE OF AUTOMATIC TEMPORARY INJUNCTION ISSUED - ATTORNEY

01/18/2022: SUMMONS AND NOTICE OF AUTOMATIC TEMPORARY INJUNCTION ISSUED - ATTORNEY

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE & WAIVER

02/15/2022: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE & WAIVER

NOTICE OF CHILD SUPPORT PROCEEDING

03/18/2022: NOTICE OF CHILD SUPPORT PROCEEDING

CERTIFICATE OF COMPLETION - :JESSICA CENOBIO

03/25/2022: CERTIFICATE OF COMPLETION - :JESSICA CENOBIO

DECREE OF DIVORCE AND DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

04/27/2022: DECREE OF DIVORCE AND DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

ORDER & NOTICE TO WITHHOLD INCOME FOR PAYMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT

05/12/2022: ORDER & NOTICE TO WITHHOLD INCOME FOR PAYMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: O; Description: ORDER & NOTICE TO WITHHOLD INCOME FOR PAYMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • DispositionDisposition; Disposed: DIVORCE GRANTED (DECREE OR ORDER); Judge; Party Details; Respondent: CENOBIO, BERNABE ROBLES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketCode: CTFREE; Description: JUDGE SEIGARS BENCH DOCKET: FINAL: PLTF W/LAMUNYON; DEFT FTA; DEFT SIGNED DECREE, DIVORCE GRANTED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketCode: DISPDIV; Description: DIVORCE GRANTED; Count: 1; Party: CENOBIO, BERNABE ROBLES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: DDIV; Description: DECREE OF DIVORCE AND DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: CCOMP; Description: CERTIFICATE OF COMPLETION - :JESSICA CENOBIO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: NO; Description: NOTICE OF CHILD SUPPORT PROCEEDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: EAW; Description: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE & WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: RECEIPT # 2022-510625 ON 01/18/2022. PAYOR: LAMUNYON LAW FIRM TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 272.14. LINE ITEMS: FD-2022-19: $193.00 ON AC01 CLERK FEES. FD-2022-19: $6.00 ON AC23 LAW LIBRARY FEE CIVIL AND CRIMINAL. FD-2022-19: $1.66 ON AC31 COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND. FD-2022-19: $5.00 ON AC58 OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES. FD-2022-19: $1.55 ON AC59 COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND. FD-2022-19: $7.00 ON AC64 DISPUTE MEDIATION FEES CIVIL ONLY. FD-2022-19: $0.45 ON AC65 STATE JUDICIAL REVOLVING FUND, INTERPRETER SVCS. FD-2022-19: $2.48 ON AC67 DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND. FD-2022-19: $25.00 ON AC79 OCIS REVOLVING FUND. FD-2022-19: $10.00 ON AC81 LENGTHY TRIAL FUND. FD-2022-19: $10.00 ON AC88 SHERIFFS SERVICE FEE FOR COURT HOUSE SECURITY. FD-2022-19: $10.00 ON AC89 COURT CLERK'S RECORDS MANAGEMENT AND PRESERVATION FEE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OCIS HAS AUTOMATICALLY ASSIGNED JUDGE SEIGARS, JASON TO THIS CASE.

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 183.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCode: DIVMC; Description: DIVORCE WITH MINOR CHILDREN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FAMILY AND DOMESTIC INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: DIVORCE WITH MINOR CHILDREN(DIVMC); Filed By: CENOBIO, JESSICA L

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAMUNYON, JUSTIN