This case was last updated from Rogers County Courts on 03/21/2022 at 21:04:16 (UTC).

In Re the marriage of Dustin Hopper, Petitioner, v. Courtney Hopper, Respondent.

Case Summary

On 03/26/2021 In Re the marriage of Dustin Hopper, Petitioner filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Courtney Hopper, Respondent. This case was filed in Rogers County Courts, Rogers County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Smith, David. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-111

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Rogers, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Smith, David

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Hopper, Dustin

Respondent

Hopper, Courtney

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Sanbrano, Jenny

Attorney at Rahmeier & Sanbrano

210 South Florence, P. O. Box 767

Claremore, OK 74018

Respondent Attorney

Campbell, Vanessa

418 W 4Th St

Claremore, OK 74017

 

Court Documents

APPLICATION FOR FUTHER TEMPORARY ORDER PURSUANT TO 43 O.S. 110 A. 4. AND B. 1.

03/26/2021: APPLICATION FOR FUTHER TEMPORARY ORDER PURSUANT TO 43 O.S. 110 A. 4. AND B. 1.

NOTICE OF CHILD SUPPORT PROCEEDING

03/26/2021: NOTICE OF CHILD SUPPORT PROCEEDING

ORDER AND NOTICE OF HEARING

03/30/2021: ORDER AND NOTICE OF HEARING

RETURN OF SERVICE OF LICENSED PROCESS SERVER (PPS COURTNEY HOPPER 03-30-21)

04/01/2021: RETURN OF SERVICE OF LICENSED PROCESS SERVER (PPS COURTNEY HOPPER 03-30-21)

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE/VANESSA CAMPBELL FOR RESPONDENT

04/05/2021: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE/VANESSA CAMPBELL FOR RESPONDENT

RESPONDENT'S RESPONSE TO PETITIONER'S APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY ORDER AND RESPONDENT'S APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY ORDER

04/05/2021: RESPONDENT'S RESPONSE TO PETITIONER'S APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY ORDER AND RESPONDENT'S APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY ORDER

RESPONDENT'S RESPONSE TO PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND COUNTER-CLAIM FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

04/05/2021: RESPONDENT'S RESPONSE TO PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND COUNTER-CLAIM FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

JUDGE SMITH NO CR COMES ON FOR PETITIONERS APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY ORDER HEARING ATTY SANBRANO PRESENT TELEPHONICALLY FOR PETITIONER ATTY CAMPBELL PRESENT WITH RESPONDENT, NOT SWORN CONFERENCE HELD ATTY CAMPBELL ANNOUNCES TO COURT AFTER ATTY'S CONF

04/21/2021: JUDGE SMITH NO CR COMES ON FOR PETITIONERS APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY ORDER HEARING ATTY SANBRANO PRESENT TELEPHONICALLY FOR PETITIONER ATTY CAMPBELL PRESENT WITH RESPONDENT, NOT SWORN CONFERENCE HELD ATTY CAMPBELL ANNOUNCES TO COURT AFTER ATTY'S CONFERENCED IS THERE IS AN AGREED TEMPORARY ORDER FORTHCOMING

REPLY AND RESPONSE OF PETITIONER TO RESPONDENT'S RESPONSE AND COUNTERCLAIM

04/27/2021: REPLY AND RESPONSE OF PETITIONER TO RESPONDENT'S RESPONSE AND COUNTERCLAIM

REPLY AND RESPONSE OF PETITIONER TO RESPONDENT'S RESPONSE AND COUNTER APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY ORDER

04/27/2021: REPLY AND RESPONSE OF PETITIONER TO RESPONDENT'S RESPONSE AND COUNTER APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY ORDER

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: R; Description: REPLY AND RESPONSE OF PETITIONER TO RESPONDENT'S RESPONSE AND COUNTER APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: R; Description: REPLY AND RESPONSE OF PETITIONER TO RESPONDENT'S RESPONSE AND COUNTERCLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • HearingEvent: PET'S APLI FOR TO HEARING; Docket: David Smith

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: CTFREE; Description: JUDGE SMITH; NO CR COMES ON FOR PETITIONERS APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY ORDER HEARING; ATTY SANBRANO PRESENT TELEPHONICALLY FOR PETITIONER; ATTY CAMPBELL PRESENT WITH RESPONDENT, NOT SWORN; CONFERENCE HELD; ATTY CAMPBELL ANNOUNCES TO COURT AFTER ATTY'S CONFERENCED IS THERE IS AN AGREED TEMPORARY ORDER FORTHCOMING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: RESP; Description: RESPONDENT'S RESPONSE TO PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND COUNTER-CLAIM FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: RESP; Description: RESPONDENT'S RESPONSE TO PETITIONER'S APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY ORDER AND RESPONDENT'S APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: EAA; Description: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE/VANESSA CAMPBELL FOR RESPONDENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: RET; Description: RETURN OF SERVICE OF LICENSED PROCESS SERVER (PPS COURTNEY HOPPER 03-30-21)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: OH; Description: ORDER AND NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: RECEIPT # 2021-637711 ON 03/26/2021. PAYOR: RAHMEIER & SANBRANO PLLC TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 272.14. LINE ITEMS: FD-2021-111: $193.00 ON AC01 CLERK FEES. FD-2021-111: $6.00 ON AC23 LAW LIBRARY FEE CIVIL AND CRIMINAL. FD-2021-111: $1.66 ON AC31 COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND. FD-2021-111: $5.00 ON AC58 OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES. FD-2021-111: $1.55 ON AC59 COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND. FD-2021-111: $7.00 ON AC64 DISPUTE MEDIATION FEES CIVIL ONLY. FD-2021-111: $0.45 ON AC65 STATE JUDICIAL REVOLVING FUND, INTERPRETER SVCS. FD-2021-111: $2.48 ON AC67 DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND. FD-2021-111: $25.00 ON AC79 OCIS REVOLVING FUND. FD-2021-111: $10.00 ON AC81 LENGTHY TRIAL FUND. FD-2021-111: $10.00 ON AC88 SHERIFFS SERVICE FEE FOR COURT HOUSE SECURITY. FD-2021-111: $10.00 ON AC89 COURT CLERK'S RECORDS MANAGEMENT AND PRESERVATION FEE.

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office; Amount: $ 183.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketCode: DIVMC; Description: DIVORCE WITH MINOR CHILDREN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FAMILY AND DOMESTIC INITIAL FILING.; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: DIVORCE WITH MINOR CHILDREN(DIVMC); Filed By: Hopper, Dustin; Disposed: Pending.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sanbrano, Jenny