This case was last updated from Canadian County Courts on 07/23/2022 at 18:34:58 (UTC).

In Re the marriage of DAVID EUGENE ESTES, Petitioner, v. JANCIE MARIE MCCOMAS ESTES, Respondent.

Case Summary

On 09/09/2021 In Re the marriage of DAVID EUGENE ESTES, Petitioner filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against JANCIE MARIE MCCOMAS ESTES, Respondent. This case was filed in Canadian County Courts, Canadian County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Gass, Charles. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-490

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Canadian, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Gass, Charles

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ESTES, DAVID EUGENE

Respondent

MCCOMAS ESTES, JANCIE MARIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

CHRISTENSEN, CATHY M

2929 Nw 138Th St

Oklahoma City, OK 73134

Respondent Attorney

MORRIS, RACHEL S

39 East 15Th Street

Edmond, OK 73013

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS AND NOTICE OF AUTOMATIC TEMPORARY INJUNCTION ISSUED

09/09/2021: SUMMONS AND NOTICE OF AUTOMATIC TEMPORARY INJUNCTION ISSUED

FAMILY AND DOMESTIC INITIAL FILING.//PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE//FILED

09/09/2021: FAMILY AND DOMESTIC INITIAL FILING.//PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE//FILED

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE/FILED

09/09/2021: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE/FILED

PETITIONER'S APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS//FILED

09/09/2021: PETITIONER'S APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS//FILED

ORIGINAL SUMMONS AND NOTICE OF AUTOMATIC TEMPORARY INJUNCTION//FILED *NO INDICATION OF SERVICE MADE*

09/20/2021: ORIGINAL SUMMONS AND NOTICE OF AUTOMATIC TEMPORARY INJUNCTION//FILED *NO INDICATION OF SERVICE MADE*

SIGNATURE PAGE FOR HAND DELIVERY OF PARENTING CLASSES//FILED

09/20/2021: SIGNATURE PAGE FOR HAND DELIVERY OF PARENTING CLASSES//FILED

ISSUED SUMMONS AND NOTICE OF AUTOMATIC TEMPORARY INJUNCTION//FILED

09/22/2021: ISSUED SUMMONS AND NOTICE OF AUTOMATIC TEMPORARY INJUNCTION//FILED

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE//FILED

09/23/2021: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE//FILED

RESPONDENT'S OBJECTION AND RESPONSE TO PETITIONER'S APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS, AND COUNTER APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS//FILED

09/23/2021: RESPONDENT'S OBJECTION AND RESPONSE TO PETITIONER'S APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS, AND COUNTER APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS//FILED

ANSWER AND COUNTER PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE//FILED

09/23/2021: ANSWER AND COUNTER PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE//FILED

PETITIONER'S REPLY TO RESPONDENT'S OBJECTION AND COUNTER-APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS//FILED

11/03/2021: PETITIONER'S REPLY TO RESPONDENT'S OBJECTION AND COUNTER-APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS//FILED

PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR ORDER TO MEDIATE//FILED

11/03/2021: PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR ORDER TO MEDIATE//FILED

NOTICE OF HEARING//FILED

11/03/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING//FILED

PETITIONER'S REPLY TO RESPONDENT'S COUNTER-PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE/FILED

11/03/2021: PETITIONER'S REPLY TO RESPONDENT'S COUNTER-PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE/FILED

CERTIFICATE OF COMPLETION OF PARENTING CLASS//FILED

11/15/2021: CERTIFICATE OF COMPLETION OF PARENTING CLASS//FILED

RESPONDENT'S OBJECTION AND RESPONSE TO PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR ORDER TO MEDIATION//FILED

11/17/2021: RESPONDENT'S OBJECTION AND RESPONSE TO PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR ORDER TO MEDIATION//FILED

DECREE OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE//FILED

03/22/2022: DECREE OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE//FILED

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2022
  • DispositionDisposition; Disposed: DIVORCE GRANTED (DECREE OR ORDER); Judge; Party Details; Petitioner: ESTES, DAVID EUGENE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DispositionDisposition; Disposed: DIVORCE GRANTED (DECREE OR ORDER); Judge; Party Details; Respondent: MCCOMAS ESTES, JANCIE MARIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: DDM; Description: DECREE OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE//FILED; Party: ESTES, DAVID EUGENE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • HearingEvent: RESPONDENT'S APPLICATION FOR TO AND ANSWER *STRICKEN PER AGREEMENT*; Party: MCCOMAS ESTES,JANCIEMARIE; Docket: Charles Gass

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: OBJ; Description: RESPONDENT'S OBJECTION AND RESPONSE TO PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR ORDER TO MEDIATION//FILED; Party: MCCOMAS ESTES, JANCIE MARIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: DIEPC; Description: CERTIFICATE OF COMPLETION OF PARENTING CLASS//FILED; Party: ESTES, DAVID EUGENE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: R; Description: PETITIONER'S REPLY TO RESPONDENT'S COUNTER-PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE/FILED; Party: ESTES, DAVID EUGENE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: NOH; Description: NOTICE OF HEARING//FILED; Party: ESTES, DAVID EUGENE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: MO; Description: PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR ORDER TO MEDIATE//FILED; Party: ESTES, DAVID EUGENE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: R; Description: PETITIONER'S REPLY TO RESPONDENT'S OBJECTION AND COUNTER-APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS//FILED; Party: ESTES, DAVID EUGENE

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 183.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketCode: DIVMC; Description: DIVORCE WITH MINOR CHILDREN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FAMILY AND DOMESTIC INITIAL FILING.//PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE//FILED; Count: 1; Party: ESTES, DAVID EUGENE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: DIVORCE WITH MINOR CHILDREN(DIVMC); Filed By: ESTES, DAVID EUGENE

    Read MoreRead Less