This case was last updated from Pushmataha County Courts on 04/17/2022 at 09:56:23 (UTC).

In Re the marriage of Connie Armstrong, Petitioner, v. James Armstrong, Respondent.

Case Summary

On 10/07/2021 In Re the marriage of Connie Armstrong, Petitioner filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against James Armstrong, Respondent. This case was filed in Pushmataha County Courts, Pushmataha County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Wallace, Jana Kay. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1-52

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Pushmataha, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Wallace, Jana Kay

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Armstrong, Connie

Respondent

Armstrong, James

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Perry, Alan

108 W. Jackson

Hugo, OK 74743

 

Court Documents

FAMILY AND DOMESTIC INITIAL FILING.

10/07/2021: FAMILY AND DOMESTIC INITIAL FILING.

SUMMONS FEE

10/07/2021: SUMMONS FEE

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE

10/07/2021: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE

01/06/2022: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE

AMENDED PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

01/06/2022: AMENDED PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

ORDER AND NOTICE OF STATUS AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE

01/06/2022: ORDER AND NOTICE OF STATUS AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE

PARTIES HAVE RECONCILED AT THIS TIME. STATUS SET 4-7-22 9:30A

02/10/2022: PARTIES HAVE RECONCILED AT THIS TIME. STATUS SET 4-7-22 9:30A

MOTION TO DISMISS

04/07/2022: MOTION TO DISMISS

ORDER OF DISMISSAL

04/07/2022: ORDER OF DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2022
  • HearingEvent: Motion Docket

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DispositionDisposition; Disposed: DISMISSED; Judge; Party Details; Respondent: Armstrong, James

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: O; Description: ORDER OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: MO; Description: MOTION TO DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • HearingEvent: Motion Docket

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: CTFREE; Description: PARTIES HAVE RECONCILED AT THIS TIME. STATUS SET 4-7-22 9:30A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: O; Description: ORDER AND NOTICE OF STATUS AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: AMP; Description: AMENDED PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: EAA; Description: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: RECEIPT # 2021-91394 ON 10/07/2021. PAYOR: ALAN M PERRY TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 272.14. LINE ITEMS: FD-2021-52: $193.00 ON AC01 CLERK FEES. FD-2021-52: $6.00 ON AC23 LAW LIBRARY FEE CIVIL AND CRIMINAL. FD-2021-52: $1.66 ON AC31 COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND. FD-2021-52: $5.00 ON AC58 OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES. FD-2021-52: $1.55 ON AC59 COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND. FD-2021-52: $7.00 ON AC64 DISPUTE MEDIATION FEES CIVIL ONLY. FD-2021-52: $0.45 ON AC65 STATE JUDICIAL REVOLVING FUND, INTERPRETER SVCS. FD-2021-52: $2.48 ON AC67 DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND. FD-2021-52: $25.00 ON AC79 OCIS REVOLVING FUND. FD-2021-52: $10.00 ON AC81 LENGTHY TRIAL FUND. FD-2021-52: $10.00 ON AC88 SHERIFFS SERVICE FEE FOR COURT HOUSE SECURITY. FD-2021-52: $10.00 ON AC89 COURT CLERK'S RECORDS MANAGEMENT AND PRESERVATION FEE.

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 183.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketCode: DIVMC; Description: DIVORCE WITH MINOR CHILDREN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FAMILY AND DOMESTIC INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: DIVORCE WITH MINOR CHILDREN(DIVMC); Filed By: Armstrong, Connie

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Perry, Alan