This case was last updated from Garfield County Courts on 07/12/2021 at 21:09:53 (UTC).

In Re the marriage of BOBBY KENEMORE, JR., Petitioner, v. KAROLINA KENEMORE, Respondent.

Case Summary

On 07/10/2018 In Re the marriage of BOBBY KENEMORE, JR , Petitioner filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against KAROLINA KENEMORE, Respondent. This case was filed in Garfield County Courts, Garfield County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Seigars, Jason. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-248

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Garfield, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Seigars, Jason

 

Party Details

Petitioner

KENEMORE, JR., BOBBY

Respondent

KENEMORE, KAROLINA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BOX, CRAIG L

Po Box 1549

Enid, OK 73702

Respondent Attorney

HODGDEN, JOHN

205 West Maplesuite 806

Enid, OK 73701

 

Court Documents

PETITIONER'S APPLICATION FOR CONTEMPT

08/24/2020: PETITIONER'S APPLICATION FOR CONTEMPT

ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE

07/11/2018: ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE

SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM SERVED 9/16/20 HOLTZEN ENGINEERING GROUP PC

09/17/2020: SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM SERVED 9/16/20 HOLTZEN ENGINEERING GROUP PC

RESPONSE TO MOTION TO SETTLE JOURNAL ENTRY

03/26/2020: RESPONSE TO MOTION TO SETTLE JOURNAL ENTRY

TEMPORARY ORDERS

09/08/2020: TEMPORARY ORDERS

PETITIONER'S REPLY TO REPONDENT'S RESPONSE TO MOTION TO SETTLE JOURNAL ENTRY AND OBJECTION TO RESPONDENT'S REQUEST FOR ORDERS REGARDING TRANSCRIPTS OF COURT PROCEEDINGS

06/28/2021: PETITIONER'S REPLY TO REPONDENT'S RESPONSE TO MOTION TO SETTLE JOURNAL ENTRY AND OBJECTION TO RESPONDENT'S REQUEST FOR ORDERS REGARDING TRANSCRIPTS OF COURT PROCEEDINGS

JUDICIAL ORDER FOR PROPER CONDUCT OF SEPARATED OR DIVORCED PARENTS

09/08/2020: JUDICIAL ORDER FOR PROPER CONDUCT OF SEPARATED OR DIVORCED PARENTS

PETITIONER'S RESPONSE TO RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF DEADLINE FOR FILING PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW

06/28/2021: PETITIONER'S RESPONSE TO RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF DEADLINE FOR FILING PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW

ORDER

09/22/2020: ORDER

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2021
  • HearingEvent: Motion Docket; Docket: Jason Seigars

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: R; Description: PETITIONER'S REPLY TO REPONDENT'S RESPONSE TO MOTION TO SETTLE JOURNAL ENTRY AND OBJECTION TO RESPONDENT'S REQUEST FOR ORDERS REGARDING TRANSCRIPTS OF COURT PROCEEDINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: RESP; Description: PETITIONER'S RESPONSE TO RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF DEADLINE FOR FILING PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: RESP; Description: RESPONSE TO MOTION TO SETTLE JOURNAL ENTRY AND REQUEST FOR ORDERS REGARDING TRANSCRIPTS OF COURT PROCEEDINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: MO; Description: MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF DEADLINE FOR FILING PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: MOSJE; Description: PETITIONER'S MOTION TO SETTLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • HearingEvent: FINAL HEARING; Docket: Jason Seigars

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketCode: CTFREE; Description: JUDGE SEIGARS BENCH DOCKET: DAY #4 FINAL HRG: PLTF/BOX; DEFT/HODGDEN; WITNESSES SWORN AND TESTIFIED; PARTIES ARE DIVORCED AS OF THIS DAY; COURT, AS REQUEST OF PARTIES, AWARDS TAX DEPENDENCY FOR 2020 TO PLTF; COURT, AS REQUEST OF PARTIES, GRANTS DEFT REQUEST FOR SUMMER VISIT TO POLAND OVER PLTF'S OBJECTION; REMAINING SUMMER VISITATION TO PLTF BEGINNING 5/28/21; ALT HOLIDAYS W/PLTF TO RECEIVE MEMORIAL DAY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • HearingEvent: FINAL HEARING; Docket: Jason Seigars

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketCode: CTFREE; Description: JUDGE SEIGARS BENCH DOCKET: PLTF/BOX BY PHONE; DEFT/HODGDEN; PLTF MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE HEARD; ARGUMENTS; DEFT STRONGLY OBJECTS BASED UPON PREVIOUS DELAYS, DIFFICULTY IN RESCHEDULING W/INTERPRETER AND VARIOUS OTHER ARGUMENTS; COURT GRANTS PLTF MOTION FOR CONT OVER DEFT OBJECTIONS; FINAL HEARING CONCLUSION 5/25/2021 @ 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
97 More Docket Entries
  • 07/10/2018
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 183.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • DocketCode: DIVMC; Description: DIVORCE WITH MINOR CHILDREN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FAMILY AND DOMESTIC INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: DIVORCE WITH MINOR CHILDREN(DIVMC); Filed By: KENEMORE, JR., BOBBY

    Read MoreRead Less