This case was last updated from Tulsa County Courts on 11/11/2021 at 00:32:56 (UTC).

In Re the marriage of ASHLEY M. WILSON HUTTON, Petitioner, v. DAVID L. HUTTON, Respondent.

Case Summary

On 05/28/2021 In Re the marriage of ASHLEY M WILSON HUTTON, Petitioner filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against DAVID L HUTTON, Respondent. This case was filed in Tulsa County Courts, Tulsa County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1372

  • Filing Date:

    05/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Tulsa, Oklahoma

 

Party Details

Petitioner

WILSON HUTTON, ASHLEY M.

Respondent

HUTTON, DAVID L.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

BEARD, MICHAEL J

1736 S Carson

Tulsa, OK 74119

 

Court Documents

PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

05/28/2021: PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

PETITIONER'S APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS

05/28/2021: PETITIONER'S APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS

REQUEST FOR PARENTING PLAN CONFERENCE-JUDGE BILL HIDDLE IN ROOM 605 AT 9AM ON 06/09/21

05/28/2021: REQUEST FOR PARENTING PLAN CONFERENCE-JUDGE BILL HIDDLE IN ROOM 605 AT 9AM ON 06/09/21

TULSA COUNTY PARENTING PLANNING CONFERENCE ATTESTATION FORM

06/09/2021: TULSA COUNTY PARENTING PLANNING CONFERENCE ATTESTATION FORM

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE & WAIVER

06/09/2021: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE & WAIVER

TULSA COUNTY PARENTING PLANNING CONFERENCE ATTESTATION FORM

06/09/2021: TULSA COUNTY PARENTING PLANNING CONFERENCE ATTESTATION FORM

AGREED TEMPORARY ORDERS

06/18/2021: AGREED TEMPORARY ORDERS

AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

06/22/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

DIVORCE IMPACT EDUCATIONAL PROGRAM COMPLETION

07/02/2021: DIVORCE IMPACT EDUCATIONAL PROGRAM COMPLETION

CERTIFICATE OF ATTENDANCE

08/18/2021: CERTIFICATE OF ATTENDANCE

CO-PARENTING FOR RESILENCE REGISTRATION FORM

08/31/2021: CO-PARENTING FOR RESILENCE REGISTRATION FORM

VERIFICATION BY ATTORNEY OF RECORD OF DISCLAIMER OF INTEREST BY DHS

10/26/2021: VERIFICATION BY ATTORNEY OF RECORD OF DISCLAIMER OF INTEREST BY DHS

JOINT CUSTODY PLAN

11/05/2021: JOINT CUSTODY PLAN

CONSENT DECREE OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

11/05/2021: CONSENT DECREE OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketCode: AFM; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: DDM; Description: CONSENT DECREE OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: JCP; Description: JOINT CUSTODY PLAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DispositionDisposition; Disposed: DIVORCE GRANTED (DECREE OR ORDER); Judge; Party Details; Respondent: HUTTON, DAVID L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketCode: DISPDIV; Description: GODSBY, MARY ANN (FD DOCKET E): PETITIONER REPRESENTED BY MICHAEL BEARD. RESPONDENT PRO SE. COURT REVIEWED THE AFFIDAVIT OF JURISDICTIONAL TESTIMONY AND DECREE. CONSENT DIVORCE WITH JOINT CUSTODY GRANTED. ALL AS PER CONSENT DECREE OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND JOINT CUSTODY PLAN WITH CHILD SUPPORT COMPUTATION ENTERED AND SIGNED. FILED IN JUDGE'S OUTBOX UNDER MICHAEL BEARD.; Count: 1; Party: HUTTON, DAVID L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: VERIFICATION BY ATTORNEY OF RECORD OF DISCLAIMER OF INTEREST BY DHS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketCode: AFD; Description: JURISDICTIONAL TESTIMONY AFFIDAVIT; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CO-PARENTING FOR RESILENCE REGISTRATION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: CER; Description: CERTIFICATE OF ATTENDANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: DIEPC; Description: DIVORCE IMPACT EDUCATIONAL PROGRAM COMPLETION; Party: WILSON HUTTON, ASHLEY M.

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; Amount: $ 183.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketCode: DIVMC; Description: DIVORCE WITH MINOR CHILDREN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FAMILY AND DOMESTIC INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: DIVORCE WITH MINOR CHILDREN(DIVMC); Filed By: WILSON HUTTON, ASHLEY M.

    Read MoreRead Less