This case was last updated from Pottawatomie County Courts on 06/02/2023 at 07:27:08 (UTC).

IN RE: FAMILY AND DOMESTIC PROCEEDINGS FOR TYESHA MONIQUE MYCHELE GUNN AND HAYDEN ALEXANDER GUNN

Case Summary

On 01/13/2023 IN RE FAMILY AND DOMESTIC PROCEEDINGS FOR TYESHA MONIQUE MYCHELE GUNN AND HAYDEN ALEXANDER GUNN was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Pottawatomie County Courts, Pottawatomie County Courthouse located in Pottawatomie, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is MCDANIEL, TRACY L.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0015

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Pottawatomie, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

MCDANIEL, TRACY L.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GUNN, TYESHA MONIQUE MYCHELE

Defendant

GUNN, HAYDEN ALEXANDER

 

Court Documents

FILE PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

01/13/2023: FILE PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

FILE ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND WAIVER OF SERVICE

01/17/2023: FILE ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND WAIVER OF SERVICE

FILE JOINT APPLICATION TO WAIVE THE NINETY DAY WAITING

01/17/2023: FILE JOINT APPLICATION TO WAIVE THE NINETY DAY WAITING

FILE ORDER TO WAIVE WAITING PERIOD

01/27/2023: FILE ORDER TO WAIVE WAITING PERIOD

FILE DIEPC: PARTY COMPLETED DIVORCE IMPACT EDUCATIONAL

01/27/2023: FILE DIEPC: PARTY COMPLETED DIVORCE IMPACT EDUCATIONAL

FILE DIEPC: PARTY COMPLETED DIVORCE IMPACT EDUCATIONAL

01/27/2023: FILE DIEPC: PARTY COMPLETED DIVORCE IMPACT EDUCATIONAL

FILE CHILD SUPPORT COMPUTATION

02/13/2023: FILE CHILD SUPPORT COMPUTATION

FILE DECREE OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE. BOTH PARTIES

02/13/2023: FILE DECREE OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE. BOTH PARTIES

 

Docket Entries

02/13/2023

HearingEvent: HEARING DATE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/13/2023

HearingEvent: DECREE OF DISSOLUTION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/13/2023

HearingEvent: COURT ORDER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/13/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: HAVE DIVIDED THEIR PROPERTY AS ORDERED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/13/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: HAVE LEGAL CUSTODY OF THE MINOR CHILDREN. BOTH PARTIES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/13/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PRIMARY CUSTODY OF THE MINOR CHILDREN. BOTH PARTIES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/13/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ARE AWARDED DISSOLUTION. THE PETITONER SHALL HAVE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/13/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE DECREE OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE. BOTH PARTIES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/13/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE CHILD SUPPORT COMPUTATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/27/2023

HearingEvent: DIEPC-DIVORCE IMPACT EDUCATIONAL PROGRAM COMPLETTION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
29 More Docket Entries
01/13/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/13/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/13/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/13/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/13/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/13/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/13/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/13/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/13/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/13/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; Amount: $ 183.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less