This case was last updated from Murray County Courts on 03/16/2022 at 07:56:34 (UTC).

IN RE: FAMILY AND DOMESTIC PROCEEDINGS FOR TRAVIS COOPER AND KIMBERLY COOPER

Case Summary

On 01/29/2021 IN RE FAMILY AND DOMESTIC PROCEEDINGS FOR TRAVIS COOPER AND KIMBERLY COOPER was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Murray County Courts, Murray County Courthouse located in Statewide, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is DUCK, AARON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0007

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Murray, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

DUCK, AARON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COOPER, TRAVIS

Defendant

COOPER, KIMBERLY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2021
  • HearingEvent: DIVORCE GRANTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • HearingEvent: COURT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DECREE OF DIVORCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND WAIVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AJE: COST DUE TO CARD ALLOCATION FEE; Amount: $ 6.56

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -0.25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -0.04

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -0.13

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -0.25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -0.18

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGHTY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OCIS; Amount: $ 25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION; Amount: $ 7.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY; Amount: $ 6.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PETITION FILED; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office; Amount: $ 183.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less