This case was last updated from Ottawa County Courts on 04/16/2022 at 00:28:14 (UTC).

IN RE: FAMILY AND DOMESTIC PROCEEDINGS FOR TOU HMONG LOR AND MAI SEE XIONG

Case Summary

On 09/21/2021 IN RE FAMILY AND DOMESTIC PROCEEDINGS FOR TOU HMONG LOR AND MAI SEE XIONG was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Ottawa County Courts, Ottawa County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is MCAFFREY, JENNIFER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0109

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Ottawa, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

MCAFFREY, JENNIFER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOR, TOU HMONG

Defendant

XIONG, MAI SEE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2023
  • HearingEvent: CIVIL-COURT CLERK TRACKING ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: VISITATION SCHEDULE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DECREE OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SUMMARY OF SUPPORT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DIEPC: PARTY COMPLETED DIVORCE IMPACT EDUCATIONAL PROG.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DIEPC: PARTY COMPLETED DIVORCE IMPACT EDUCATIONAL PROG.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CHILD SUPPORT COMPUTATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: MARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: QUICK CLAIM DEED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AUTOMATIC TEMPORARY INJUNCTION NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PETITION FILED; Amount: $ 183.00

    Read MoreRead Less