This case was last updated from Stephens County Courts on 05/11/2022 at 04:15:27 (UTC).

IN RE: FAMILY AND DOMESTIC PROCEEDINGS FOR SHERI SUZETTE VAUGHN AND KENNETH D'WAYNE VAUGHN

Case Summary

On 07/05/2018 IN RE FAMILY AND DOMESTIC PROCEEDINGS FOR SHERI SUZETTE VAUGHN AND KENNETH D'WAYNE VAUGHN was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Stephens County Courts, Stephens County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is RUSSELL, G. BRENT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0122

  • Filing Date:

    07/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Stephens, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

RUSSELL, G. BRENT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VAUGHN, SHERI SUZETTE

Defendant

VAUGHN, KENNETH D'WAYNE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JACKET MINUTE: PAUPERS AFFIDAVIT DENIED PER GBR SS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • HearingEvent: ST:COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DD: DECREE OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE BY DEFAULT GBR MH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SUMMONS RET SERVED KENNETH VAUGHN 7/5/18 BJ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ISSUE SUMMONS (KENNETH WAYNE VAUGHN) LC; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT. LC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PAUPER'S AFFIDAVIT. LC; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 2.48

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/05/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CHSC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 7-1-07; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; Amount: $ 183.00

    Read MoreRead Less