This case was last updated from Osage County Courts on 04/13/2022 at 19:55:55 (UTC).

IN RE: FAMILY AND DOMESTIC PROCEEDINGS FOR SHELBIE MCQUAY AND RYAN MCQUAY

Case Summary

On 03/08/2021 IN RE FAMILY AND DOMESTIC PROCEEDINGS FOR SHELBIE MCQUAY AND RYAN MCQUAY was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Osage County Courts, Osage County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is TATE, STUART. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0022

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Osage, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

TATE, STUART

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MCQUAY, SHELBIE

Defendant

MCQUAY, RYAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2021
  • HearingEvent: COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DECREE OF DIVORCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CT MINUTE TAKEN ON 5-17-21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: MATTER TO BE RESET UPON APPLICATION BY EITHER PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE & WAIVER FILED BY RESP. 5-14-21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: HALLWAY. NEITHER PARTIES APPEARS COURT REVIEWS FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CM JUDGE ESTES, COURT SOUNDED NAMES OF PARTIES 3X IN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • HearingEvent: HEARING SET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE & WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT CLERK PRESERVATION FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CHSC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OCIS; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 183.00

    Read MoreRead Less