This case was last updated from Pontotoc County Courts on 05/17/2022 at 05:19:51 (UTC).

IN RE: FAMILY AND DOMESTIC PROCEEDINGS FOR SHAWN HURLEY AND VANASSA HURLEY

Case Summary

On 05/14/2018 IN RE FAMILY AND DOMESTIC PROCEEDINGS FOR SHAWN HURLEY AND VANASSA HURLEY was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Pontotoc County Courts, Pontotoc County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is JACKSON, LORI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0057

  • Filing Date:

    05/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Pontotoc, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

JACKSON, LORI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HURLEY, SHAWN

Defendant

HURLEY, VANASSA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

BROOKING, MEAGAN

805 East Main, Po Box 1711

Ada, OK 74821

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2020
  • HearingEvent: COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • HearingEvent: NON-JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE DECREE OF DIVORCE AND DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • HearingEvent: JACKSON DOMESTIC DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • HearingEvent: DIVORCE IMPACT EDUCATIONAL PROGRAM COMPETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (VANASSA HURLEY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DIEPC: PARTY COMPLETED DIVORCE IMPACT EDUCATIONAL PROGRA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • HearingEvent: JACKSON DOMESTIC DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • HearingEvent: JACKSON DOMESTIC DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE ORDER OF THE COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 05/14/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PETITION APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY ORDER; Amount: $ 183.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DEPOSIT BY MEAGAN BROOKING CK $262.14

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BROOKING, MEAGAN