This case was last updated from Marshall County Courts on 08/11/2021 at 00:23:50 (UTC).

IN RE: FAMILY AND DOMESTIC PROCEEDINGS FOR ROBERT JAMES PHELPS AND DEBORAH ANN BAKER PHELPS

Case Summary

On 06/01/2018 IN RE FAMILY AND DOMESTIC PROCEEDINGS FOR ROBERT JAMES PHELPS AND DEBORAH ANN BAKER PHELPS was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Marshall County Courts, Marshall County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHNSON, GREGORY L.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0036

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Marshall, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

JOHNSON, GREGORY L.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PHELPS, ROBERT JAMES

Defendant

PHELPS, DEBORAH ANN BAKER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

RAINBOLT, KEN

P.O. Box 207323 W. Main

Durant, OK 74702

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/07/2018
  • DocketDescription: DECREE OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • HearingEvent: TRIAL ON MERITS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • HearingEvent: COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • DocketDescription: SUMMARY ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SETTING TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • DocketDescription: AND RETURN AND EXCLUSIVE POSSESSION OF '09 DODGE RAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • DocketDescription: MOTION FOR EMERGENCY ORDER OF TEMPORARY SPOUSAL SUPPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • DocketDescription: MOTION FOR EMERGENCY ORDER OF TEMPORARY SPOUSAL SUPPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • DocketDescription: MOTION TO SET FOR TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • DocketDescription: RESPONSE AND COUNTERCLAIM FOR DIVORCE (NO CHILDREN)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 06/01/2018
  • DocketDescription: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • DocketDescription: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • DocketDescription: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • DocketDescription: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • DocketDescription: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • DocketDescription: LENGHTY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • DocketDescription: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • DocketDescription: DISPUTE MEDIATION ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • DocketDescription: LAW LIBRARY ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • DocketDescription: FILE AND ENTER PETITION; Amount: $ 183.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RAINBOLT, KEN