This case was last updated from Pittsburg County Courts on 05/13/2022 at 04:26:24 (UTC).

IN RE: FAMILY AND DOMESTIC PROCEEDINGS FOR RAYMOND LEE RISENHOOVER AND MARISSA LEE RISENHOOVER

Case Summary

On 07/17/2018 IN RE FAMILY AND DOMESTIC PROCEEDINGS FOR RAYMOND LEE RISENHOOVER AND MARISSA LEE RISENHOOVER was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Pittsburg County Courts, Pittsburg County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is BEARE, MINDY M.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0144

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Pittsburg, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

BEARE, MINDY M.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RISENHOOVER, RAYMOND LEE

Defendant

RISENHOOVER, MARISSA LEE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

QUINTON, ELLEN

Attorney at GOTCHER, BEAVER & QUINTON

Po Box 160

Mcalester, OK 74502

 

Court Documents

AGREED TEMPORARY ORDER S/BEARE

07/24/2018: AGREED TEMPORARY ORDER S/BEARE

MOTION FOR ENFORCEMENT OF NON-CUSTIAL PARENT VISITATION

09/28/2018: MOTION FOR ENFORCEMENT OF NON-CUSTIAL PARENT VISITATION

ORDER TO APPEAR SET FOR 10-3-18 AT 1:30PM. S/BEARE

09/28/2018: ORDER TO APPEAR SET FOR 10-3-18 AT 1:30PM. S/BEARE

ENTRY OF APPERANCE FOR THE RESPONDENT

10/16/2018: ENTRY OF APPERANCE FOR THE RESPONDENT

ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIM

10/16/2018: ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIM

MOTION TO MODIFY TEMPORARY ORDER

11/13/2018: MOTION TO MODIFY TEMPORARY ORDER

ORDER FOR HEARING SET FOR 12-05-2018 AT 1:30PM S/BEARE

11/13/2018: ORDER FOR HEARING SET FOR 12-05-2018 AT 1:30PM S/BEARE

AGREED ORDER MODIFYING TEMPORARY ORDER S/BEARE

12/06/2018: AGREED ORDER MODIFYING TEMPORARY ORDER S/BEARE

MOTION TO WITHDRAW

01/17/2019: MOTION TO WITHDRAW

ORDER SETTING HEARING FOR MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR

01/22/2019: ORDER SETTING HEARING FOR MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR

ORDER ALLOWING WITHDRAWAL S/BEARE

01/30/2019: ORDER ALLOWING WITHDRAWAL S/BEARE

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2021
  • HearingEvent: DISMISSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: RULING: DISMISSED. S/BEARE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CM COMES ON FOR: DISPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STRICKEN AS MOOT. S/BEARE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JOURNAL RULING: MOTION TO SETTLE JOURNAL ENTRY IS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: MIN ORDER DATED 1-30-19 COMES ON FOR: MOTION TO SETTLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • HearingEvent: MOTION TO WITHDRAW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER ALLOWING WITHDRAWAL S/BEARE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 1-30-19 AT 1:30PM. S/BEARE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER SETTING HEARING FOR MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR

    Read MoreRead Less
48 More Docket Entries
  • 07/17/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: F&E PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; Amount: $ 183.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: NON-COMPUTER CASE AMOUNT DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer QUINTON, ELLEN