This case was last updated from Kay County Courts on 04/13/2022 at 13:41:21 (UTC).

IN RE: FAMILY AND DOMESTIC PROCEEDINGS FOR RAMOND NEAL BOWERS AND SHERRY LYNN BOWERS

Case Summary

On 05/29/2018 IN RE FAMILY AND DOMESTIC PROCEEDINGS FOR RAMOND NEAL BOWERS AND SHERRY LYNN BOWERS was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Kay County Courts, Kay County Courthouse - Newkirk Division located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is TURNER, LEE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0104

  • Filing Date:

    05/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Kay, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

TURNER, LEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BOWERS, RAMOND NEAL

Defendant

BOWERS, SHERRY LYNN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

YATES, GRACE K

Attorney at HOLMES, YATES & JOHNSON

P.O. Box 750

Ponca City, OK 74602

 

Court Documents

DECREE OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE (3CC)

06/20/2018: DECREE OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE (3CC)

AMENDED DECREE OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE (3CC)

06/22/2018: AMENDED DECREE OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE (3CC)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2038
  • HearingEvent: DESTRUCTION REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AMENDED DECREE OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE (3CC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF THE AUTOMATIC TEMPORARY INJUNCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND WAIVER OF SERVICE AND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: EXCEPT TO EACH OTHER. ALL AS PER DECREE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: EXCEPT THAT NEITHER PARTY MAY REMARRY FOR SIX MONTHS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: IN THE DECREE. THIS DIVORCE IS FINAL AS OF THIS DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CHILD CUSTODY AND CHILD SUPPORT ARE ORDERED AS SET OUT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: INCOMPATIBILITY. DIVISION OF PROPERTY & DEBTS;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OF MARRIAGE FROM RESPONDENT ON THE GROUNDS OF

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 05/29/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE-EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office; Amount: $ 183.00

    Read MoreRead Less