This case was last updated from Pittsburg County Courts on 02/22/2022 at 14:13:45 (UTC).

IN RE: FAMILY AND DOMESTIC PROCEEDINGS FOR MIRANDA MENGERS AND CHEYENNE MENGERS

Case Summary

On 01/14/2021 IN RE FAMILY AND DOMESTIC PROCEEDINGS FOR MIRANDA MENGERS AND CHEYENNE MENGERS was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Pittsburg County Courts, Pittsburg County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is BEARE, MINDY M.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0007

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Pittsburg, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

BEARE, MINDY M.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MENGERS, MIRANDA

Defendant

MENGERS, CHEYENNE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

QUINTON, ELLEN

Attorney at GOTCHER, BEAVER & QUINTON

Po Box 160

Mcalester, OK 74502

HALE, DAVID

Po Box 313

Talihina, OK 74571

 

Court Documents

F&E PETITION OF MARRIAGE

01/14/2021: F&E PETITION OF MARRIAGE

PETITIONER'S APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY ORDER

01/14/2021: PETITIONER'S APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY ORDER

ORDER SETTING HEARINGNOTICE OF HEARING SET FOR FEBUARY

01/14/2021: ORDER SETTING HEARINGNOTICE OF HEARING SET FOR FEBUARY

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE

02/12/2021: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE

CM 2-17-21, COMES ON FOR: APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY

02/22/2021: CM 2-17-21, COMES ON FOR: APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BY MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • HearingEvent: HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • HearingEvent: DIVORCE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT/FINAL ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DIVORCE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT (FINAL ORDER) S/BEARE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AND SUBMIT THE ORDER. S/BEARE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AGREEMENT ON A FINAL ORDER. MS. QUINTON WILL PREPARE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: RULING: PARTIES ANNOUNCED THEY HAVE REACHED AN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CT MIN. COMES ON FOR: TEMPORARY ORDER HEARING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • HearingEvent: CONTINUED FOR SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER. RULING: CONTINUED FOR SERVICE. S/BEARE.

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: F&E PETITION OF MARRIAGE; Amount: $ 183.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer QUINTON, ELLEN