This case was last updated from Creek County Courts on 06/15/2022 at 00:50:11 (UTC).

IN RE: FAMILY AND DOMESTIC PROCEEDINGS FOR MIKALA LAWRENCE AND SHAWN RAY MCGEHEE

Case Summary

On 09/21/2021 IN RE FAMILY AND DOMESTIC PROCEEDINGS FOR MIKALA LAWRENCE AND SHAWN RAY MCGEHEE was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Creek County Courts, Creek County Courthouse - Sapulpa Division located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is SERNER, JASON C.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0222

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Creek, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

SERNER, JASON C.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LAWRENCE, MIKALA

Defendant

MCGEHEE, SHAWN RAY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

STINNETT LAW

404 E Dewey Ste 100

Sapulpa, OK 74066

STINNETT, CARLA R

404 E Dewey, Harlin Building

Sapulpa, OK 74066

DARNELL, ANNE

Stinnett Law, 404 E Dewey Ave Ste 100

Sapulpa, OK 74066

 

Court Documents

PETITIONER'S APPLICATION FOR EMERGENCY EX PARTE

09/21/2021: PETITIONER'S APPLICATION FOR EMERGENCY EX PARTE

ORDER

09/21/2021: ORDER

UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AND ENFORCEMENT ACT

09/21/2021: UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AND ENFORCEMENT ACT

CM:JS:9-27-21:PETITIONER'S APPLICATION FOR EMERGENCY EX

09/27/2021: CM:JS:9-27-21:PETITIONER'S APPLICATION FOR EMERGENCY EX

ORDER SETTING HEARING SET 11-4-21 AT 1:30 PM

10/13/2021: ORDER SETTING HEARING SET 11-4-21 AT 1:30 PM

AGREED ORDER ESTABLISHING PATERNITY

02/17/2022: AGREED ORDER ESTABLISHING PATERNITY

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER ALLOWING WITHDRAWAL BY: STINNETT LAW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: BY: STINNETT LAW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: APPLICATION TO WITHDRAW AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AGREED ORDER ESTABLISHING PATERNITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: RESPONDENT NOTICE OF FILING CERTIFICATE OF COMPLETION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • HearingEvent: JS: DOMESTIC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AGREED TEMPORARY ORDER TO BE SUBMITTED WITHIN 10 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CM:JS:NOCSR, 11-4-21 - ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIM ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CERT MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PROOF OF DELIVERY - SHAWN MCGEHEE SERVED 10-4-21 BY

    Read MoreRead Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CHSC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AND ENTER PETITION; Amount: $ 183.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer STINNETT LAW