This case was last updated from McIntosh County Courts on 04/29/2022 at 09:12:58 (UTC).

IN RE: FAMILY AND DOMESTIC PROCEEDINGS FOR MICHAEL JESS MESSER AND MARY KATHERN MESSER

Case Summary

On 05/23/2018 IN RE FAMILY AND DOMESTIC PROCEEDINGS FOR MICHAEL JESS MESSER AND MARY KATHERN MESSER was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in McIntosh County Courts, McIntosh County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is BLAND, JAMES D.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0061

  • Filing Date:

    05/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    McIntosh, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

BLAND, JAMES D.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MESSER, MICHAEL JESS

Defendant

MESSER, MARY KATHERN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2018
  • HearingEvent: DISSOLUTION OF MARRAIGE PRO-SE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • HearingEvent: COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DECREE OF DIVORCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER FOR HEARING (6-14-18 @9:00 AM)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: MOTION FOR HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AJE: COST DUE TO CARD ALLOCATION FEE; Amount: $ 6.31

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -0.25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -0.04

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -0.13

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 05/23/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CHSC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PETITION FOR PRO/SE DIVORCE/DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; Amount: $ 183.00

    Read MoreRead Less