This case was last updated from Pottawatomie County Courts on 06/08/2023 at 07:32:12 (UTC).

IN RE: FAMILY AND DOMESTIC PROCEEDINGS FOR MICHAEL BENNETT AND MALARIE BENNETT

Case Summary

On 01/26/2023 IN RE FAMILY AND DOMESTIC PROCEEDINGS FOR MICHAEL BENNETT AND MALARIE BENNETT was filed as a Family - Legal Separation lawsuit. This case was filed in Pottawatomie County Courts, Pottawatomie County Courthouse located in Pottawatomie, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is MUELLER, EMILY J.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0022

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Legal Separation

  • County, State:

    Pottawatomie, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

MUELLER, EMILY J.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BENNETT, MICHAEL

Defendant

BENNETT, MALARIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

WILSON, GREG

SUTTON, PAUL

GARDNER, JOHN

DOCKREY, AMANDA C.

 

Court Documents

FILE COURT MINUTE. COMES ON FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE.

06/01/2023: FILE COURT MINUTE. COMES ON FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE.

FILE MOTION TO MODIFY TEMPORARY ORDER AND AWARD

05/30/2023: FILE MOTION TO MODIFY TEMPORARY ORDER AND AWARD

FILE PETITONER'S RESPONSE TO RESPONDENT'S MULTIPLE

05/17/2023: FILE PETITONER'S RESPONSE TO RESPONDENT'S MULTIPLE

FILE RESPONSE TO PETITIONER'S MOTION TO APPOINT A

05/17/2023: FILE RESPONSE TO PETITIONER'S MOTION TO APPOINT A

FILE EARLY SETTLEMENT MEDIATION. NO AGREEMENT

05/09/2023: FILE EARLY SETTLEMENT MEDIATION. NO AGREEMENT

FILE PETITIONER'S RESPONSE TO RESPONDENT'S FIRST

05/03/2023: FILE PETITIONER'S RESPONSE TO RESPONDENT'S FIRST

FILE MULTIPLE MOTIONS FOR ADDITIONAL TEMPORARY ORDERS

05/02/2023: FILE MULTIPLE MOTIONS FOR ADDITIONAL TEMPORARY ORDERS

FILE MOTION TO APPOINT A GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR MINOR

04/26/2023: FILE MOTION TO APPOINT A GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR MINOR

FILE MOTION TO AMEND SCHEDULING ORDER

04/26/2023: FILE MOTION TO AMEND SCHEDULING ORDER

FILE FIRST AMENDED CROSS-PETITON

04/24/2023: FILE FIRST AMENDED CROSS-PETITON

FILE TEMPORARY ORDERS

04/10/2023: FILE TEMPORARY ORDERS

FILE PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL TO JOHN GARDNER

03/22/2023: FILE PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL TO JOHN GARDNER

FILE COURT MINUTE. PARTIES APPEAR WITH COUNSEL FOR

03/07/2023: FILE COURT MINUTE. PARTIES APPEAR WITH COUNSEL FOR

FILE JUDICIAL ORDER FOR PROPER CONDUCT OF DIVORCED

03/07/2023: FILE JUDICIAL ORDER FOR PROPER CONDUCT OF DIVORCED

FILE PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER. THIS CASE IS SET FOR

03/07/2023: FILE PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER. THIS CASE IS SET FOR

FILE ENTRY OF APPEARANCE OF CO-COUNSEL. AMANDA DOCKREY

03/07/2023: FILE ENTRY OF APPEARANCE OF CO-COUNSEL. AMANDA DOCKREY

FILE COURT MINUTE. COMES ON FOR AN EMERGENCY CUSTODY

02/24/2023: FILE COURT MINUTE. COMES ON FOR AN EMERGENCY CUSTODY

FILE RESPONDENT'S AFFIDAVIT

02/24/2023: FILE RESPONDENT'S AFFIDAVIT

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/20/2023
  • HearingEvent: PROTECTIVE ORDER DOCKET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: THE PROTECTIVE ORDER ARE SET FOR 6-20-23 @9:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: THEY ARE NOT READY FOR TRIAL SETTING. ALL MOTIONS AND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: BOTH PARTIES PRESENT WITH COUNSEL. BOTH PARTIES STATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE COURT MINUTE. COMES ON FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • HearingEvent: PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: TEMPORARY SOLE CUSTODY TO PETITIONER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE MOTION TO MODIFY TEMPORARY ORDER AND AWARD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: MOTIONS FOR ADDITIONAL TEMPORARY ORDERS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE PETITONER'S RESPONSE TO RESPONDENT'S MULTIPLE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
59 More Docket Entries
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE PETITION FOR LEAGAL SEPERATION; Amount: $ 183.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less