This case was last updated from McIntosh County Courts on 10/01/2021 at 02:19:55 (UTC).

IN RE: FAMILY AND DOMESTIC PROCEEDINGS FOR MELINDA LANGE AND STEPHEN DOUGLAS LANGE

Case Summary

On 11/24/2020 IN RE FAMILY AND DOMESTIC PROCEEDINGS FOR MELINDA LANGE AND STEPHEN DOUGLAS LANGE was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in McIntosh County Courts, Mcintosh County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is MCLAUGHLIN, BRIAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0075

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    McIntosh, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

MCLAUGHLIN, BRIAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LANGE, MELINDA

Defendant

LANGE, STEPHEN DOUGLAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

QUINTON, ELLEN

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

P.O. Box 160

Mcalester, OK 74502

EAGAN LAW OFFICE

Attorney at EAGAN LAW OFFICE

150 Foley Ave

Eufaula, OK 74432

 

Court Documents

RESPONSE TO PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND

12/14/2020: RESPONSE TO PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE OF CSS

01/04/2021: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE OF CSS

MINUTE ORDER MOTION FOR EXPEDIATED HEARING ON CUSTODY

09/28/2021: MINUTE ORDER MOTION FOR EXPEDIATED HEARING ON CUSTODY

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2021
  • HearingEvent: HEARING ON TEMPORARY ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • HearingEvent: HEARING ON TEMPORARY ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: PITTSBURG CO 10-28-21 @1:00 P.M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: AND VISITATION AND REQUEST FOR TEMP ORDER. HRG. IN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MINUTE ORDER MOTION FOR EXPEDIATED HEARING ON CUSTODY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: COURTHOUSE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: COURT MINUTE: (10-28-21 @ 1 P.M. @ THE PITTSBURG COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SETTING HEARING(09-28-21 @ 9A)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: AND REQUEST FOR TEMPORARY ORDER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOTION FOR EXPEDIATED HEARING ON CUSTODY AND VISITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketDescription: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketDescription: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketDescription: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketDescription: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketDescription: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketDescription: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketDescription: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketDescription: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketDescription: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketDescription: FILE & ENTER PETITION FOR DIVORCE; Amount: $ 183.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer QUINTON, ELLEN