This case was last updated from Kingfisher County Courts on 04/25/2022 at 07:43:29 (UTC).

IN RE: FAMILY AND DOMESTIC PROCEEDINGS FOR MAURICIA LAUREN JONES AND STEPHEN ANDREW JONES

Case Summary

On 06/29/2018 IN RE FAMILY AND DOMESTIC PROCEEDINGS FOR MAURICIA LAUREN JONES AND STEPHEN ANDREW JONES was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Kingfisher County Courts, Kingfisher County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVIS, ROBERT E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0029

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Kingfisher, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

DAVIS, ROBERT E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JONES, MAURICIA LAUREN

Defendant

JONES, STEPHEN ANDREW

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

WISNER, KEVIN R

Attorney at WISNER LAW FIRM

703 S Western Rd

Stillwater, OK 74074

OPPEL, MATTHEW R

Po Box 555

Kingfisher, OK 73750

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2018
  • HearingEvent: COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • HearingEvent: DECREE OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DECREE OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: RETURN SUMMONS - CARD RETURNED STEPHEN JONES 7-7-18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ISSUING 1 SUMMONS - TO ATTY; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AJE: COST DUE TO CARD ALLOCATION FEE; Amount: $ 6.31

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -0.25

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 06/29/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 7/1/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE & ENTER PETITION - DIVORCE; Amount: $ 183.00

    Read MoreRead Less