This case was last updated from Cherokee County Courts on 04/23/2022 at 18:06:33 (UTC).

IN RE: FAMILY AND DOMESTIC PROCEEDINGS FOR MARVIN TARRON AND PENNY TARRON

Case Summary

On 06/29/2018 IN RE FAMILY AND DOMESTIC PROCEEDINGS FOR MARVIN TARRON AND PENNY TARRON was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Cherokee County Courts, Cherokee County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is CROSSLIN, SANDY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0118

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Cherokee, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

CROSSLIN, SANDY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TARRON, MARVIN

Defendant

TARRON, PENNY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

WALES, DEANNA M.

226 S. Muskogee

Tahlequah, OK 74464

 

Court Documents

ORDER FOR HEARING

08/20/2018: ORDER FOR HEARING

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DECREE OF DISSOLUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • HearingEvent: COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: MO 9-10; D.WALES TO PREPARE DECREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • HearingEvent: DOCKET-CROSSLIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER FOR HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE, CONSENT AND WAIVER OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 2.48

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/29/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE & ENTER PETITION; Amount: $ 183.00

    Read MoreRead Less