This case was last updated from Pottawatomie County Courts on 01/07/2023 at 17:22:57 (UTC).

IN RE: FAMILY AND DOMESTIC PROCEEDINGS FOR KAYLA DIANE KIRBY AND RICHARD ANDREW KIRBY

Case Summary

On 02/22/2021 IN RE FAMILY AND DOMESTIC PROCEEDINGS FOR KAYLA DIANE KIRBY AND RICHARD ANDREW KIRBY was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Pottawatomie County Courts, Pottawatomie County Courthouse located in Seminole, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is MCDANIEL, TRACY L.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0051

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Pottawatomie, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

MCDANIEL, TRACY L.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KIRBY, KAYLA DIANE

Defendant

KIRBY, RICHARD ANDREW

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

LIND, CHRISTOPHER C

104 East Main Street

Norman, OK 73069

MILLER, MARIANNE

P.O. Box 1095, 935 N. Kickapoo

Shawnee, OK 74802

 

Court Documents

FILE ORDER SETTING HEARING. THIS MATTER COMES ON FOR

12/22/2022: FILE ORDER SETTING HEARING. THIS MATTER COMES ON FOR

FILE NOTICE SETTING HEARING (MOTION TO ENTER). HEARING

12/15/2022: FILE NOTICE SETTING HEARING (MOTION TO ENTER). HEARING

FILE MOTION TO ENTER

12/09/2022: FILE MOTION TO ENTER

FILE OKDHS NOTICE OF NECESSARY PARTY

12/01/2022: FILE OKDHS NOTICE OF NECESSARY PARTY

FILE PETITIONER'S RESPONSE TO COUNTER-MOTION TO MODIFY

11/09/2022: FILE PETITIONER'S RESPONSE TO COUNTER-MOTION TO MODIFY

FILE RESPONDENT'S RESPONSE TO MOTION TO MODIFY CHILD

10/26/2022: FILE RESPONDENT'S RESPONSE TO MOTION TO MODIFY CHILD

FILE ENTRY OF APPEARANCE CHRISTOPHER C. LIND AND FOR

10/26/2022: FILE ENTRY OF APPEARANCE CHRISTOPHER C. LIND AND FOR

FILE NOTICE OF POST-DECREE PROCEEDING TO RICHARD D.

10/05/2022: FILE NOTICE OF POST-DECREE PROCEEDING TO RICHARD D.

FILE ENTRY OF APPEARANCE MARIANNE MILLER ON BEHALF OF

10/05/2022: FILE ENTRY OF APPEARANCE MARIANNE MILLER ON BEHALF OF

FILE MOTION TO MODIFY

10/05/2022: FILE MOTION TO MODIFY

FILE COURT MINUTE - MATTER FOR WAIVER DIVORCE IS SET

03/25/2021: FILE COURT MINUTE - MATTER FOR WAIVER DIVORCE IS SET

FILE CERTIFICATE OF COMPETION - KAYLA D. KIRBY

03/24/2021: FILE CERTIFICATE OF COMPETION - KAYLA D. KIRBY

FILE CERTIFICATE OF COMPLETION - RICHARD A KIRBY

03/24/2021: FILE CERTIFICATE OF COMPLETION - RICHARD A KIRBY

FILE PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

02/22/2021: FILE PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

FILE DECREE OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE - AS OF 5-3-21

05/03/2021: FILE DECREE OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE - AS OF 5-3-21

FILE ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND WAIVER

02/24/2021: FILE ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND WAIVER

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2023
  • HearingEvent: MOTION DOCKET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AND VISITATIONS. HEARING IS SET FOR 2-28-2023 AT 1:30

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: MOTION TO MODIFY CHILD SUPPORT AND EXTABLISH CUSTODY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE ORDER SETTING HEARING. THIS MATTER COMES ON FOR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: IS SET FOR 2-28-23 AT 1:30 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE NOTICE SETTING HEARING (MOTION TO ENTER). HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE MOTION TO ENTER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE OKDHS NOTICE OF NECESSARY PARTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CHILD SUPPORT AND TO ESTABLISH CUSTODY AND VISITATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
62 More Docket Entries
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; Amount: $ 183.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less