This case was last updated from Pottawatomie County Courts on 04/17/2023 at 09:47:50 (UTC).

IN RE: FAMILY AND DOMESTIC PROCEEDINGS FOR JOYCE A GELINO AND RUSSELL R GELINO

Case Summary

On 01/11/2023 IN RE FAMILY AND DOMESTIC PROCEEDINGS FOR JOYCE A GELINO AND RUSSELL R GELINO was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Pottawatomie County Courts, Pottawatomie County Courthouse located in Pottawatomie, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is MCDANIEL, TRACY L.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0010

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Pottawatomie, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

MCDANIEL, TRACY L.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GELINO, JOYCE A

Defendant

GELINO, RUSSELL R

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

OFFICER, TROY

SUTTON, PAUL

 

Court Documents

FILE PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

01/11/2023: FILE PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

FILE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY ORDER

01/11/2023: FILE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY ORDER

FILE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RUSSELL R. GELINO WAS SERVED

01/24/2023: FILE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RUSSELL R. GELINO WAS SERVED

FILE ENTRY OF APPEARANCE TROY OFFICER ON BEHALF OF THE

02/08/2023: FILE ENTRY OF APPEARANCE TROY OFFICER ON BEHALF OF THE

FILE RESPONDENT'S ANSWER TO APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY

02/08/2023: FILE RESPONDENT'S ANSWER TO APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY

FILE RESPONDENT'S ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIM

02/08/2023: FILE RESPONDENT'S ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIM

FILE ORDER SETTING HEARING - TEMPORARY ORDER HEARING

03/13/2023: FILE ORDER SETTING HEARING - TEMPORARY ORDER HEARING

FILE ORDER FOR HEARING

03/13/2023: FILE ORDER FOR HEARING

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2023
  • HearingEvent: HEARING DATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE ORDER FOR HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SET FOR 5-2-23 AT 9:00 A.M.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE ORDER SETTING HEARING - TEMPORARY ORDER HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE RESPONDENT'S ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE RESPONDENT'S ANSWER TO APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: RESPONDENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE ENTRY OF APPEARANCE TROY OFFICER ON BEHALF OF THE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ON 1-19-23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; Amount: $ 183.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less