This case was last updated from Ottawa County Courts on 05/19/2022 at 01:36:47 (UTC).

IN RE: FAMILY AND DOMESTIC PROCEEDINGS FOR JON ALLEN UPTON AND CHARETA LYNN UPTON

Case Summary

On 08/09/2021 IN RE FAMILY AND DOMESTIC PROCEEDINGS FOR JON ALLEN UPTON AND CHARETA LYNN UPTON was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Ottawa County Courts, Ottawa County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is MCAFFREY, JENNIFER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0096

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Ottawa, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

MCAFFREY, JENNIFER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UPTON, JON ALLEN

Defendant

UPTON, CHARETA LYNN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

WEEDN, JOHN M.

2 N Main Street Suite 600

Miami, OK 74355

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO CHARETA UPTON

08/09/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO CHARETA UPTON

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND RESERVATION OF TIME

09/01/2021: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND RESERVATION OF TIME

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2022
  • HearingEvent: COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COMBINED MOTION/ORDER TO WITHDRAW AS ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DECREE OF DISSOLUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AT 2:30PM FOR STATUS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DOUG PEWITT, PARTIES ANNOUNCES CASE IS CONTD TO 4-11-22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: WEEDN, RESPONDENT APPEARS IN PERSON AND BY ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CM JM PETITIONER APPEARS IN PERSON AND BY ATTORNEY JOHN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COMPLETE DISCOVERY 30 DAYS BEFORE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SHALL EXCHANGE WITNESS/EXHIBIT LISTS 10 DAYS BEFORE AND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: EFFECTS. SET FOR TRIAL ON 3-18-22 @ 10:00 AM. PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND-EFFECTIVE 1-1-05; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE OR SEPARATE MAINT.; Amount: $ 183.00

    Read MoreRead Less