This case was last updated from McCurtain County Courts on 06/15/2022 at 09:47:10 (UTC).

IN RE: FAMILY AND DOMESTIC PROCEEDINGS FOR JEREMY LEE SPENCER AND CHASIDY CYNE SPENCER

Case Summary

On 04/08/2021 IN RE FAMILY AND DOMESTIC PROCEEDINGS FOR JEREMY LEE SPENCER AND CHASIDY CYNE SPENCER was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in McCurtain County Courts, McCurtain County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is FARLEY, KENNETH R.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0046

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    McCurtain, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

FARLEY, KENNETH R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SPENCER, JEREMY LEE

Defendant

SPENCER, CHASIDY CYNE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

RAGLAND, TIM

119 N Central Ave, Po Box 28

Idabel, OK 74745

 

Court Documents

RETURN MAIL

06/14/2022: RETURN MAIL

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: RETURN MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • HearingEvent: PRO SE DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT MINUTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: TO PLEAD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND WAIVER OF SUMMONS AND OF TIME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: INJUNCTION-SERVED CS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SUMMONS & NOTICE OF AUTOMATIC TEMPORARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SHERIFF SERVICE FEE; Amount: $ 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ISSUE SUMMONS; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CHSC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/07; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISSOLUTION PETITION; Amount: $ 183.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RAGLAND, TIM