This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 04/25/2022 at 15:08:58 (UTC).

IN RE: FAMILY AND DOMESTIC PROCEEDINGS FOR JENNIFER LYNN HORNE AND GARY JONATHAN HORNE

Case Summary

On 05/31/2018 IN RE FAMILY AND DOMESTIC PROCEEDINGS FOR JENNIFER LYNN HORNE AND GARY JONATHAN HORNE was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Seminole County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is ANDERSON, HONORABLE CHRIS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0048

  • Filing Date:

    05/31/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

ANDERSON, HONORABLE CHRIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HORNE, JENNIFER LYNN

Defendant

HORNE, GARY JONATHAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

CARTER, M. BRADLEY

P.O. Box 1508

Seminole, OK 74818

CHISM, ANDREA

7011 Hatton Rd

Amarillow, TX 79110

 

Court Documents

ORDER ALLOWING ATTORNEY TO WITHDRAW

12/11/2018: ORDER ALLOWING ATTORNEY TO WITHDRAW

COURT MINUTE: JUDGE SMITH

12/11/2018: COURT MINUTE: JUDGE SMITH

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • HearingEvent: HEARING - ANDERSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT MINUTE, ANDERSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • HearingEvent: HEARING - ANDERSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FAMILY DIVISION COURT MINUTE, ANDERSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT MINUTE - CONTEMPT CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
64 More Docket Entries
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: VISITATION, APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RELIEF; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PETITION TO ESTABLISH CUSTODY, CHILD SUPPORT AND; Amount: $ 183.00

    Read MoreRead Less