This case was last updated from Kay County Courts on 05/26/2022 at 01:28:19 (UTC).

IN RE: FAMILY AND DOMESTIC PROCEEDINGS FOR IRMA LOZANO AND MILTON CARLOS LOZANO

Case Summary

On 04/01/2021 IN RE FAMILY AND DOMESTIC PROCEEDINGS FOR IRMA LOZANO AND MILTON CARLOS LOZANO was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Kay County Courts, Kay County Courthouse - Newkirk Division located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is BROCK, JENNIFER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0050

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Kay, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

BROCK, JENNIFER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOZANO, IRMA

Defendant

LOZANO, MILTON CARLOS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

FRANCO, ALBERTO

11740 E 21St Street

Tulsa, OK 74129

PARRISH, CHARLES M.

616 S Boston Ave, Ste 200

Tulsa, OK 74119

 

Court Documents

PETITIONER'S APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS

04/01/2021: PETITIONER'S APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS

VERIFICATION BY ATTORNEY OF RECORD OF DISCLAIMER OF

04/30/2021: VERIFICATION BY ATTORNEY OF RECORD OF DISCLAIMER OF

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

02/18/2022: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

DOMESTIC COURT MINUTE. (COPIES MAILED TO ATTY'S)

03/16/2022: DOMESTIC COURT MINUTE. (COPIES MAILED TO ATTY'S)

INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER

03/16/2022: INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER

ORDER AUTHORIZING PARTIES TO FULFILL EDUCATIONAL

03/17/2022: ORDER AUTHORIZING PARTIES TO FULFILL EDUCATIONAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2022
  • HearingEvent: HRG - NEWKIRK (DIV) BROCK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING DISVOERY; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PEITIONER'S NOTICE OF COMPLETOIN OF PARENTING CLASS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: REQUIRMENT VIRTUALLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER AUTHORIZING PARTIES TO FULFILL EDUCATIONAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FULFILL EDUCATIONAL REQUIREMENT VIRTUALLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JOINT MOTION REQUESTING AUTHORIZATION FOR PARTIES TO; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JOINT MOTION REQUESTING AUTHORIZATION FOR PARTIES TO; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • HearingEvent: HRG - NEWKIRK (DIV) BROCK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE-EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office; Amount: $ 183.00

    Read MoreRead Less