This case was last updated from Choctaw County Courts on 04/25/2022 at 02:04:33 (UTC).

IN RE: FAMILY AND DOMESTIC PROCEEDINGS FOR GUY HOWARD RORIE AND MARTHA JEANNE RORIE

Case Summary

On 11/18/2021 IN RE FAMILY AND DOMESTIC PROCEEDINGS FOR GUY HOWARD RORIE AND MARTHA JEANNE RORIE was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Choctaw County Courts, Choctaw County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is BAZE, BILL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0052

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Choctaw, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

BAZE, BILL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RORIE, GUY HOWARD

Defendant

RORIE, MARTHA JEANNE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

MCGEHEE, THERESA

Attorney at MCGEHEE & ASSOCIATES

1319 West Main

Durant, OK 74701

RAGLAND, TIM

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

P.O. Box 28

Idabel, OK 74745

 

Court Documents

UCCJEA AFFIDAVIT AS TO THE CHILD

11/18/2021: UCCJEA AFFIDAVIT AS TO THE CHILD

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/18/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED

PETITIONER'S APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS

11/18/2021: PETITIONER'S APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS

MOTION TO STRIKE TEMPORARY ORDER HEARING AND MOTION TO S

12/29/2021: MOTION TO STRIKE TEMPORARY ORDER HEARING AND MOTION TO S

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2022
  • HearingEvent: HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • HearingEvent: FINAL HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: MINUTE ORDER: MATTER SET MAY 11, 2022 AT 1:30 P.M. FOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE FOR RESPONDENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • HearingEvent: HEARING ON APPLICATION/PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: NOTICE:HEARING SET ON 3-23-2022 AT 9:30 A.M.

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE & ENTER PETITION; Amount: $ 183.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RAGLAND, TIM

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCGEHEE, THERESA