This case was last updated from Pottawatomie County Courts on 05/18/2023 at 07:40:06 (UTC).

IN RE: FAMILY AND DOMESTIC PROCEEDINGS FOR FAITH NIKOLE VANNOY AND COLE WILLIAM VANNOY

Case Summary

On 01/12/2023 IN RE FAMILY AND DOMESTIC PROCEEDINGS FOR FAITH NIKOLE VANNOY AND COLE WILLIAM VANNOY was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Pottawatomie County Courts, Pottawatomie County Courthouse located in Pottawatomie, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is MUELLER, EMILY J.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0012

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Pottawatomie, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

MUELLER, EMILY J.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VANNOY, FAITH NIKOLE

Defendant

VANNOY, COLE WILLIAM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

MILLER, MARIANNE

OFFICER, TROY

 

Court Documents

FILE PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

01/12/2023: FILE PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

FILE ENTRY OF APPEARANCE MARIANNE MILLER ON BEHALF OF

01/12/2023: FILE ENTRY OF APPEARANCE MARIANNE MILLER ON BEHALF OF

FILE ENTRY OF APPEARANCE TROY OFFICER ON BEHALF OF THE

02/24/2023: FILE ENTRY OF APPEARANCE TROY OFFICER ON BEHALF OF THE

FILE RESPONDENT'S ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIM

02/24/2023: FILE RESPONDENT'S ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIM

FILE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE COLE WILLIAM VANNOY WAS

03/08/2023: FILE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE COLE WILLIAM VANNOY WAS

FILE PETITIONER'S RESPONSE TO COUNTER-CLAIM

03/22/2023: FILE PETITIONER'S RESPONSE TO COUNTER-CLAIM

FILE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ALLYSON WHITNEY BURDEN WAS

03/22/2023: FILE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ALLYSON WHITNEY BURDEN WAS

 

Docket Entries

03/22/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SERVED ON 3-21-23

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ALLYSON WHITNEY BURDEN WAS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE PETITIONER'S RESPONSE TO COUNTER-CLAIM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/08/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SERVED ON 2-10-23 BY LEAVING A COPY WITH HIS MOTHER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/08/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE COLE WILLIAM VANNOY WAS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE RESPONDENT'S ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/24/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: RESPONDENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE ENTRY OF APPEARANCE TROY OFFICER ON BEHALF OF THE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: THE PETITIONER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE ENTRY OF APPEARANCE MARIANNE MILLER ON BEHALF OF

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
01/12/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; Amount: $ 183.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less