This case was last updated from McCurtain County Courts on 06/11/2022 at 03:15:19 (UTC).

IN RE: FAMILY AND DOMESTIC PROCEEDINGS FOR EMILY S MILLER AND MATTHEW A MILLER

Case Summary

On 05/18/2018 IN RE FAMILY AND DOMESTIC PROCEEDINGS FOR EMILY S MILLER AND MATTHEW A MILLER was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in McCurtain County Courts, McCurtain County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is FARLEY, KENNETH R.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0114

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    McCurtain, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

FARLEY, KENNETH R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MILLER, EMILY S

Defendant

MILLER, MATTHEW A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

RAGLAND, TIM

119 N Central Ave, Po Box 28

Idabel, OK 74745

GASTON, TROY

1405 W Center, 3Rd Floor

Greenwood, AR 72936

HUFFMAN, SEAN

700 S Park Drive

Broken Bow, OK 74728

 

Court Documents

ORDER

02/03/2021: ORDER

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2022
  • HearingEvent: TRIAL DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AGREED ORDER OF MODIFICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • HearingEvent: MD - PTC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER SETTING TRIAL ON PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT MINUTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER RESETTING PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • HearingEvent: MD - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: RESPONSE TO PETITIONERS COUNTER MOTION TO MODIFY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PETITIONERS'S COUNTER MOTION TO MODIFY

    Read MoreRead Less
133 More Docket Entries
  • 05/18/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/07; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISSOLUTION PETITION; Amount: $ 183.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RAGLAND, TIM

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HUFFMAN, SEAN